Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 04/10/2021 at 07:38:40 (UTC).

ALLY BANK vs. SHELTON, DARRYL

Case Summary

On 03/17/2021 ALLY BANK filed an Other lawsuit against SHELTON, DARRYL. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is BEAU MILLER. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****5499

  • Filing Date:

    03/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

BEAU MILLER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ALLY BANK

Defendants

JONES, AUBRE

SHELTON, DARRYL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

REEVES, PHILIP CHRISTOPHER

13105 Northwest

Houston, TX 77040

 

Court Documents

Proposed Order Granting Non-Suit

03/24/2021: Proposed Order Granting Non-Suit

Notice of Nonsuit Without Prejudice

03/24/2021: Notice of Nonsuit Without Prejudice

ORDER OF NON-SUIT SIGNED

03/25/2021: ORDER OF NON-SUIT SIGNED

Proposed ORDER FOR ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF SEQUESTRATION

03/17/2021: Proposed ORDER FOR ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF SEQUESTRATION

EXHIBIT B

03/17/2021: EXHIBIT B

EXHIBIT A-4

03/17/2021: EXHIBIT A-4

EXHIBIT A-3

03/17/2021: EXHIBIT A-3

EXHIBIT A-2

03/17/2021: EXHIBIT A-2

EXHIBIT A

03/17/2021: EXHIBIT A

AFFIDAVIT OF PANG-NOU KHANG

03/17/2021: AFFIDAVIT OF PANG-NOU KHANG

PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL PETITION AND APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF SEQUESTRATION

03/17/2021: PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL PETITION AND APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF SEQUESTRATION

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketDescription: NO COSTS ALLOCATED;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketDescription: ORDER OF NONSUIT SIGNED; Order Signed: 3/25/2021;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: REEVES, PHILIP CHRISTOPHER; Person Filing: ALLY BANK;

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Ally Bank is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Philip C Reeves