This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 03/18/2023 at 17:32:04 (UTC).

ALL AMERICA INSURANCE ET AL vs. ELECTRIC RELIABILITY COUNCIL OF TEXAS INC ET AL

Case Summary

On 01/31/2022 ALL AMERICA INSURANCE filed an Other lawsuit against ELECTRIC RELIABILITY COUNCIL OF TEXAS INC. This case was filed in Harris County District Courthouse, Harris County District Courthouse located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is CHRISTINE WEEMS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****3706

  • Filing Date:

    01/31/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

CHRISTINE WEEMS

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Intervenor Plaintiffs

ALL AMERICA INSURANCE ET AL

CITY NATIONAL INSURANCE

CITY NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY

INDEPENDENT SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

VELOCITY RISK UNDERWRITERS

INTERSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY COMPANY

Defendants, Intervenor Defendants and Others

ELECTRIC RELIABILITY COUNCIL OF TEXAS INC ET AL

AIR LIQUIDE LARGE INDUSTRIES U S L P

AVANGRID TEXAS REVEWABLES LLC

BARNEY DAVIS LLC

BASTROP ENERGY PARTNERS L P

BLUE CUBE OPERATIONS LLC

CALPINE CORPORATION

CAP RIDGE WIND II LLC

CAP RIDGE WIND III LLC

CAP RIDGE WIND I LLC

COLORADO BEND II POWER LLC

EIF CHANNELVIEW COGENERATION LLC

EXGEN HANDLEY POWER LLC

584 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GROTEFELD, MARK STEPHEN

Intervenor Plaintiff Attorney

BAYMAN, MAXWELL STEPHEN

Defendant Attorney

CLARK, ELLIOT

Other Attorneys

CAMPBELL, JORDAN CHRISTIAN

ALVAREZ, GRAIG J.

HIND, HOBART M.

MAHONEY, WILLIAM DAVID

REDDALL, JEFFREY S.

WEBB, FRANCIS JAMES

BOWMAN, LAWRENCE T.

SIMON, CRAIG SCOTT

BOOTH, DAVID JOHN

RAMSEY, DAENA GOLDSMITH

 

Court Documents

Filing Letter

03/14/2023: Filing Letter

Filing letter

02/28/2023: Filing letter

Filing letter

02/23/2023: Filing letter

Plaintiffs' Letter to withdraw of Notice of Appeal

02/16/2023: Plaintiffs' Letter to withdraw of Notice of Appeal

Plaintiffs' Notice of Appeal

02/14/2023: Plaintiffs' Notice of Appeal

Notice of Appearance of Additional Counsel

02/14/2023: Notice of Appearance of Additional Counsel

First Amended Petition [MDL CASE NO. 5.00178]

02/14/2023: First Amended Petition [MDL CASE NO. 5.00178]

Third Amended Petition [MDL CASE NO. 5.00178]

02/14/2023: Third Amended Petition [MDL CASE NO. 5.00178]

Plaintiffs' Request for Designation of Clerk's Record

02/14/2023: Plaintiffs' Request for Designation of Clerk's Record

Plaintiffs' Letter Requesting Reporter's Record

02/14/2023: Plaintiffs' Letter Requesting Reporter's Record

Exhibit 1 - Plaintiffs' Notice of Appeal

02/14/2023: Exhibit 1 - Plaintiffs' Notice of Appeal

Second Amended Petition in Intervention [MDL Case No. 5.00178]

02/13/2023: Second Amended Petition in Intervention [MDL Case No. 5.00178]

Intervening Plaintiffs Notice of Non-Suit without Prejudice

02/13/2023: Intervening Plaintiffs Notice of Non-Suit without Prejudice

Proposed Intervening Plaintiffs' Order of Non-Suit without Prejudice

02/13/2023: Proposed Intervening Plaintiffs' Order of Non-Suit without Prejudice

Second Amended Petition [MDL Case No. 5.00178]

02/10/2023: Second Amended Petition [MDL Case No. 5.00178]

Return Mail Undeliverable

02/07/2023: Return Mail Undeliverable

ORDER SGND DENYING STAY OF PROCEEDINGS

02/01/2023: ORDER SGND DENYING STAY OF PROCEEDINGS

ORDER SIGNED DENYING MOTION T0 DISMISS

01/26/2023: ORDER SIGNED DENYING MOTION T0 DISMISS

516 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

02/14/2023

DocketDescription: THIRD AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: RAMSEY, DAENA GOLDSMITH; Person Filing: RLI INSURANCE COMPANY;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/14/2023

DocketDescription: THIRD AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: RAMSEY, DAENA GOLDSMITH; Person Filing: HDI INSURANCE;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/14/2023

DocketDescription: THIRD AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: RAMSEY, DAENA GOLDSMITH; Person Filing: CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/14/2023

DocketDescription: THIRD AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: RAMSEY, DAENA GOLDSMITH; Person Filing: ALL AMERICA INSURANCE ET AL;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/14/2023

DocketDescription: THIRD AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: RAMSEY, DAENA GOLDSMITH; Person Filing: SOUTHERN COUNTY MUTUAL INSURANCE;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/14/2023

DocketDescription: THIRD AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: RAMSEY, DAENA GOLDSMITH; Person Filing: MT. HAWLEY INSURANCE COMPANY;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/14/2023

DocketDescription: THIRD AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: RAMSEY, DAENA GOLDSMITH; Person Filing: RLI INSURANCE COMPANY;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/13/2023

DocketDescription: SECOND AMENDED INTERVENTION; Filing Attorney: WEBB, FRANCIS JAMES; Person Filing: HORACE MANN INSURANCE COMPANY;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/10/2023

DocketDescription: SECOND AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: GROTEFELD, MARK STEPHEN; Person Filing: SOUTHERN COUNTY MUTUAL INSURANCE;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/10/2023

DocketDescription: SECOND AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: GROTEFELD, MARK STEPHEN; Person Filing: RLI INSURANCE COMPANY;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
402 More Docket Entries
03/16/2022

DocketDescription: INTERVENTION; Filing Attorney: GROTEFELD, MARK STEPHEN; Person Filing: FIREMEN INSURANCE COMPANY OF WASHINGTON;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/16/2022

DocketDescription: INTERVENTION; Filing Attorney: GROTEFELD, MARK STEPHEN; Person Filing: GREAT DIVIDE INSURANCE COMPANY;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/16/2022

DocketDescription: INTERVENTION; Filing Attorney: GROTEFELD, MARK STEPHEN; Person Filing: NAUTILUS INSURANCE COMPANY;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/31/2022

DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: GROTEFELD, MARK STEPHEN; Person Filing: MT. HAWLEY INSURANCE COMPANY;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/31/2022

DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: GROTEFELD, MARK STEPHEN; Person Filing: RLI INSURANCE COMPANY;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/31/2022

DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: CLARK, ELLIOT; Person Filing: ALL AMERICA INSURANCE ET AL;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/31/2022

DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: GROTEFELD, MARK STEPHEN; Person Filing: RLI INSURANCE COMPANY;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/31/2022

DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: GROTEFELD, MARK STEPHEN; Person Filing: SOUTHERN COUNTY MUTUAL INSURANCE;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/31/2022

DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: GROTEFELD, MARK STEPHEN; Person Filing: CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/31/2022

DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: GROTEFELD, MARK STEPHEN; Person Filing: HDI INSURANCE;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less