This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 09/18/2021 at 07:23:24 (UTC).

ALKINS CAPITAL INVESTMENTS LTD vs. CATHAY BANK

Case Summary

On 08/25/2021 ALKINS CAPITAL INVESTMENTS LTD filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against CATHAY BANK. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is RABEEA COLLIER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****3393

  • Filing Date:

    08/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

RABEEA COLLIER

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ALKINS CAPITAL INVESTMENTS LTD

XU, NINGBO

Defendant

CATHAY BANK

Others

CATHAY BANK MAY BE SERVED BY SERVING A MANAGER OFFICER OR AGENT

9650 Flair Drive El

Monte, CA 91731

CATHAY BANK (A CALIFORNIA BANKING CORPORATION) MAY BE SERVED BY

960 Flair Drive El

Monte, CA 91731

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

OVERSTREET, JAMES NATHAN

 

Court Documents

PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL PETITION FOR WRONGFUL FORECLOSURE AND BREACH OF CONTRACT

08/25/2021: PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL PETITION FOR WRONGFUL FORECLOSURE AND BREACH OF CONTRACT

Citation (Non-Resident Corporation)

09/15/2021: Citation (Non-Resident Corporation)

Affidavit of Service

09/15/2021: Affidavit of Service

Letter

09/09/2021: Letter

Envelope

09/09/2021: Envelope

Letter to Clerk - Request for Issuance of Citation

09/01/2021: Letter to Clerk - Request for Issuance of Citation

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION (NON-RESIDENT CORPORATE); Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: CATHAY BANK (A CALIFORNIA BANKING CORPORATION) MAY BE SERVED BY; Issued: 9/2/2021; Received: 9/15/2021; Tracking: 73910685; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION(NON-RESIDENT); Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: CATHAY BANK MAY BE SERVED BY SERVING A MANAGER OFFICER OR AGENT; Issued: 8/26/2021; Served: 9/14/2021; Received: 9/15/2021; Tracking: 73906716; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: OVERSTREET, JAMES NATHAN; Person Filing: XU, NINGBO;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: OVERSTREET, JAMES NATHAN; Person Filing: ALKINS CAPITAL INVESTMENTS LTD;

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CATHAY BANK A CALIFORNIA BANK AND LENDER is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer OVERSTREET, JAMES NATHAN