This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 06/18/2015 at 23:30:10 (UTC).

ALEXANDER, RANDALL vs. A O SMITH CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 12/02/2004 ALEXANDER, RANDALL filed an Other - Complex Tort/Class Action lawsuit against A O SMITH CORPORATION. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****9051

  • Filing Date:

    12/02/2004

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Complex Tort/Class Action

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Defendants

ALEXANDER, RANDALL

AMERAFLEX RUBBER & GASKET COMPANY INC

ANCO INSULATION INC

ASARCO INCORPORATED

CROWN CORK & SEAL COMPANY INC

D & F DISTRIBUTING INC

GEORGIA PACIFIC CORPORATION

GREENE TWEED & CO

KELLY-MOORE PAINT COMPANY INC

METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY

PARS MANUFACTURING CO

A O SMITH CORPORATION

A W CHESTERTON CO

ABLE SUPPLY COMPANY

AMCHEM PRODUCTS INC (FKA RHONE-POULENC BASIC CHEMICALS)

RHONE-POULENC BASIC CHEMICALS

AMERICAN BILTRITE INC

AMERICAN BILTRITE INC (FNA AMERICAN BILTRITE RUBBER COMPANY INC)

AMERICAN CYANAMID COMPANY

AMERICAN OPTICAL CORPORATION

64 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Defendant Attorneys

BLEVINS, BRYAN O. JR.

CLARY, BRIAN S.

RAMSEY, RUSSELL J.

LACKEY, DOUG

STUART, KIMBERLY ROSE

BLAKENEY, MICHAEL LADON

GALLAGHER, KEVIN P

GALLAGHER, KEVIN PATRICK

KEITH, VICTORIA LEIGH OTT

WADE, TODD N.

RHODES, KENNETH D.

FERGUSON, RICHARD YOUNG

CARLSON, ERIC

JACKSON, JESSICA S.

WILKINSON, MELODY M.

POWELL, LISA A.

POWERS, JAMES H.

PAPPAS, GEORGE P.

Other Attorneys

CALDERON, RAUL M.

WHITE, CLAY M.

22 More Attorneys Available

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/08/2014
  • ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSED BY COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2014
  • NO COSTS ALLOCATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2009
  • FIRST AMENDED ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - LANGE, SIDNEY TODD Person Filing - HENRY VOGT MACHINE CO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2009
  • NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, PARTIAL (RULE 162)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2008
  • ORDER SIGNED SUBSTITUTING ATTORNEY OF RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2007
  • NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, PARTIAL (RULE 162)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2006
  • NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, PARTIAL (RULE 162)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2006
  • NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, PARTIAL (RULE 162)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2006
  • NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, PARTIAL (RULE 162)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2006
  • NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, PARTIAL (RULE 162)

    Read MoreRead Less
97 More Docket Entries
  • 01/31/2005
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - POWERS, JAMES H. Person Filing - CERTAINTEED CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2005
  • TRANSFERRED TO ANOTHER HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2005
  • TRANSFERRED TO HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2005
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - POWERS, JAMES H. Person Filing - AMERICAN OPTICAL CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2005
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - HENNESSY, EDWARD J. Person Filing - WASHINGTON GROUP INTERNATIONAL INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2005
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - POWERS, JAMES H. Person Filing - DANA CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2005
  • ANSWER FIRST AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - WILLINGHAM, R. MARK Person Filing - ASTENJOHNSON INC (AK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2005
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - POWERS, JAMES H. Person Filing - UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2004
  • ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - BLEVINS, BRYAN O. JR. Person Filing - ALEXANDER, RANDALL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2004
  • JURY FEE PAID (TRCP 216)

    Read MoreRead Less