This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 05/09/2020 at 08:04:37 (UTC).

ALDRIDGE, LASHONDA BANKS vs. HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEY'S OFFICE

Case Summary

On 04/15/2020 ALDRIDGE, LASHONDA BANKS filed an Other - Expungement lawsuit against HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEY'S OFFICE. This case was filed in Harris County District Courthouse, Harris County District Courthouse located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is BEAU MILLER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****3694

  • Filing Date:

    04/15/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Expungement

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

BEAU MILLER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ALDRIDGE, LASHONDA BANKS

Pasadena, TX 77505

Defendants

HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEY'S OFFICE

PASADENA MUNICIPAL COURT

Po Box 1575,

Pasadena, TX 77501

HARRIS COUNTY CSCD

HARRIS COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE

OFFICE OF COURT ADMINISTRATION

205 W 14Th St #600,

Austin, TX 78701

PASADENA POLICE DEPARTMENT

1201 Davis St,

Pasadena, TX 77506

HARRIS COUNTY PRETRIAL SERVICES

TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC SAFETY

TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF CRIMINAL JUSTICE - CJAD

209 W 14Th St,

Austin, TX 78701

HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT CLERK'S OFFICE

Others

HARRIS COUNTY PRETRIAL SERVICES BY SERVING KELVIN L BANKS DIRECTOR

102 San Jacinto

Houston, TX 77002

TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC SAFETY BY SERVING EXPUNCTION UNIT

Po Box 4143

Austin, TX 78765

HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT CLERK'S OFFICE BY SERVING RANDALL SMIDT

1310 Prairie Ste 880

Houston, TX 77002

HARRIS COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE BY SERVING MAJOR MAC MCKELVY

1200 Baker Street

Houston, TX 77002

COMMUNITY SUPERVISION & CORRECTIONS BY SERVING DR TERESA MAY PHD

102 San Jacinto

Houston, TX 77002

HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEY'S OFFICE BY SERVING SCOTT A DURFEE

1310 Prairie 5Th Floor

Houston, TX 77002

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/22/2020
  • HearingCourt: 190; Docket Type: Law Day Docket; Reason: EXPUNCTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/22/2020
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: PASADENA MUNICIPAL COURT; Issued: 4/22/2020; Tracking: 73744360; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/22/2020
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: PASADENA POLICE DEPARTMENT; Issued: 4/22/2020; Tracking: 73744359; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/22/2020
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF CRIMINAL JUSTICE - CJAD; Issued: 4/22/2020; Tracking: 73744357; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/22/2020
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: OFFICE OF COURT ADMINISTRATION; Issued: 4/22/2020; Tracking: 73744356; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/22/2020
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC SAFETY BY SERVING EXPUNCTION UNIT; Issued: 4/22/2020; Tracking: 73743054; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/22/2020
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: COMMUNITY SUPERVISION & CORRECTIONS BY SERVING DR TERESA MAY PHD; Issued: 4/22/2020; Tracking: 73743053; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/22/2020
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HARRIS COUNTY PRETRIAL SERVICES BY SERVING KELVIN L BANKS DIRECTOR; Issued: 4/22/2020; Tracking: 73743052; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/22/2020
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HARRIS COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE BY SERVING MAJOR MAC MCKELVY; Issued: 4/22/2020; Tracking: 73743051; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/22/2020
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEY'S OFFICE BY SERVING SCOTT A DURFEE; Issued: 4/22/2020; Tracking: 73743050; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/22/2020
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT CLERK'S OFFICE BY SERVING RANDALL SMIDT; Issued: 4/22/2020; Tracking: 73743049; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/16/2020
  • DocketDescription: ORDER SIGNED SETTING HEARING; Order Signed: 4/16/2020;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/15/2020
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person Filing: ALDRIDGE, LASHONDA BANKS;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PASADENA MUNICIPAL COURT is a litigant

Latest cases where HARRIS COUNTY CSCD is a litigant

Latest cases where COMMUNITY SUPERVISION AND CORRECTIONS BY SERVING DR TERESA MAY PHD is a litigant