This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 10/17/2022 at 07:18:23 (UTC).

ALDINE INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT vs. STEVENS, TED D SR

Case Summary

On 09/23/2022 ALDINE INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT filed a Tax - Other Tax lawsuit against STEVENS, TED D SR. This case was filed in Harris County District Courthouse, Harris County District Courthouse located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is BEAU MILLER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0976

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Other Tax

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

BEAU MILLER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ALDINE INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT

Defendants

STEVENS, TED D SR

Houston, TX 77066

BERBERICH, JACI

Conroe, TX 77303

HARRIS COUNTY

HARRIS COUNTY EDUCATION DEPARTMENT

PORT OF HOUSTON OF HARRIS COUNTY AUTHORITY

HARRIS COUNTY FLOOD CONTROL

HARRIS COUNTY HOSPITAL DISTRICT

LONE STAR COLLEGE SYSTEM DISTRICT

HARRIS COUNTY EMERGENCY SERVICES DISTRICT #10

HARRIS COUNTY EMERGENCY SERVICES DISTRICT 1

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MIDDLETON, KANIKA WALKER

 

Court Documents

PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL PETITION

09/23/2022: PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL PETITION

Aldine Independence School District VS. TED D Stevens SR and Jaci Berberich Citation In Delinquent Tax Suit

09/23/2022: Aldine Independence School District VS. TED D Stevens SR and Jaci Berberich Citation In Delinquent Tax Suit

Aldine Independence School District VS. Ted D Stevens SR and Jaci Berberich Citation In Delinquent Tax Suit

09/23/2022: Aldine Independence School District VS. Ted D Stevens SR and Jaci Berberich Citation In Delinquent Tax Suit

Civil Process Request: Service Form 29

09/23/2022: Civil Process Request: Service Form 29

Exhibit A

09/23/2022: Exhibit A

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/23/2022
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION (TAX SUIT); Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: BERBERICH, JACI; Issued: 9/23/2022; Tracking: 74055978; Deliver To: ATTORNEY PICK-UP

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2022
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION (TAX SUIT); Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: STEVENS, TED D SR; Issued: 9/23/2022; Served: 10/11/2022; Returned: 10/12/2022; Tracking: 74055975; Deliver To: CONSTABLE PCT 1 TAX SUIT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2022
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: MIDDLETON, KANIKA WALKER; Person Filing: ALDINE INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less