Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 06/12/2020 at 11:29:42 (UTC).

ALDINE INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT vs. RIOJAS, RUSSEL

Case Summary

On 03/26/2020 ALDINE INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT filed a Tax - Other Tax lawsuit against RIOJAS, RUSSEL. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is DONNA ROTH. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****9371

  • Filing Date:

    03/26/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Other Tax

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

DONNA ROTH

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ALDINE INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT

Defendants and Intervenor Plaintiffs

HARRIS COUNTY

HARRIS COUNTY DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION

HARRIS COUNTY HOSPITAL DISTRICT

PORT OF HOUSTON AUTHORITY OF HARRIS COUNTY

LONE STAR COLLEGE SYSTEM DISTRICT

HARRIS COUNTY FLOOD CONTROL DISTRICT

HARRIS COUNTY EMERGENCY SERVICES DISTRICT #01

HARRIS COUNTY EMERGENCY SERVICES DISTRICT #10

COWART, JEFFREY L

Humble, TX 77396

RODRIGUEZ, CHRISTINE (AKA CHRISTINE R RIOJAS)

Houston, TX 77032

RIOJAS, CHRISTINE R

COWART, JANET

Humble, TX 77396

RIOJAS, RUSSEL

Houston, TX 77032

Defendants and Intervenor Defendants

COWART, JEFFREY L

Humble, TX 77396

RODRIGUEZ, CHRISTINE (AKA CHRISTINE R RIOJAS)

Houston, TX 77032

RIOJAS, CHRISTINE R

COWART, JANET

Humble, TX 77396

RIOJAS, RUSSEL

Houston, TX 77032

13 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RAMIREZ, ANNETTE

Intervenor Plaintiff Attorney

ALFRED, MARGARET E.

 

Court Documents

Original Intervention

05/05/2020: Original Intervention

EXHIBIT A

06/11/2020: EXHIBIT A

CITATION IN DELINQUENT TAX SUIT

06/11/2020: CITATION IN DELINQUENT TAX SUIT

CITATION IN DELINQUENT TAX SUIT

06/11/2020: CITATION IN DELINQUENT TAX SUIT

CITATION IN DELINQUENT TAX SUIT

06/11/2020: CITATION IN DELINQUENT TAX SUIT

CITATION IN DELINQUENT TAX SUIT

06/11/2020: CITATION IN DELINQUENT TAX SUIT

CIVIL PROCESS REQUEST FORM

06/11/2020: CIVIL PROCESS REQUEST FORM

Citation in Delinquent Tax Suit

04/01/2020: Citation in Delinquent Tax Suit

Citation in Delinquent Tax Suit

04/01/2020: Citation in Delinquent Tax Suit

Citation in Delinquent Tax Suit

04/01/2020: Citation in Delinquent Tax Suit

Citation in Delinquent Tax Suit

04/01/2020: Citation in Delinquent Tax Suit

EXHIBIT A

03/26/2020: EXHIBIT A

CIVIL PROCESS REQUEST SERVICE FORM 29

03/26/2020: CIVIL PROCESS REQUEST SERVICE FORM 29

CITATION IN DELIQUENT TAX SUIT

03/26/2020: CITATION IN DELIQUENT TAX SUIT

CITATION IN DELIQUENT TAX SUIT

03/26/2020: CITATION IN DELIQUENT TAX SUIT

CITATION IN DELIQUENT TAX SUIT

03/26/2020: CITATION IN DELIQUENT TAX SUIT

CITATION IN DELIQUENT TAX SUIT

03/26/2020: CITATION IN DELIQUENT TAX SUIT

PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL PETITION

03/26/2020: PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL PETITION

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/11/2020
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION (TAX SUIT); Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: COWART, JANET; Issued: 6/11/2020; Tracking: 73757627; Deliver To: CONSTABLE PCT 1 TAX SUIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION (TAX SUIT); Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: COWART, JEFFREY L; Issued: 6/11/2020; Tracking: 73757626; Deliver To: CONSTABLE PCT 1 TAX SUIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION (TAX SUIT); Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: RIOJAS, CHRISTINE R; Issued: 6/11/2020; Tracking: 73757625; Deliver To: CONSTABLE PCT 1 TAX SUIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION (TAX SUIT); Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: RIOJAS, RUSSEL; Issued: 6/11/2020; Tracking: 73757624; Deliver To: CONSTABLE PCT 1 TAX SUIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2020
  • DocketDescription: INTERVENTION; Filing Attorney: ALFRED, MARGARET E.; Person Filing: LONE STAR COLLEGE SYSTEM DISTRICT;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2020
  • DocketDescription: INTERVENTION; Filing Attorney: ALFRED, MARGARET E.; Person Filing: HARRIS COUNTY HOSPITAL DISTRICT;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2020
  • DocketDescription: INTERVENTION; Filing Attorney: ALFRED, MARGARET E.; Person Filing: HARRIS COUNTY EMERGENCY SERVICES DISTRICT #01;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2020
  • DocketDescription: INTERVENTION; Filing Attorney: ALFRED, MARGARET E.; Person Filing: HARRIS COUNTY EMERGENCY SERVICES DISTRICT #10;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2020
  • DocketDescription: INTERVENTION; Filing Attorney: ALFRED, MARGARET E.; Person Filing: HARRIS COUNTY DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2020
  • DocketDescription: INTERVENTION; Filing Attorney: ALFRED, MARGARET E.; Person Filing: HARRIS COUNTY;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2020
  • DocketDescription: INTERVENTION; Filing Attorney: ALFRED, MARGARET E.; Person Filing: HARRIS COUNTY FLOOD CONTROL DISTRICT;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2020
  • DocketDescription: INTERVENTION; Filing Attorney: ALFRED, MARGARET E.; Person Filing: PORT OF HOUSTON AUTHORITY OF HARRIS COUNTY;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION (TAX SUIT); Status: SERVICE RETURNED/UNEXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: COWART, JANET; Issued: 3/26/2020; Returned: 3/30/2020; Tracking: 73738251; Deliver To: CONSTABLE PCT 1 TAX SUIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION (TAX SUIT); Status: SERVICE RETURNED/UNEXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: COWART, JEFFREY L; Issued: 3/26/2020; Returned: 3/30/2020; Tracking: 73738250; Deliver To: CONSTABLE PCT 1 TAX SUIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION (TAX SUIT); Status: SERVICE RETURNED/UNEXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: RODRIGUEZ, CHRISTINE (AKA CHRISTINE R RIOJAS); Issued: 3/26/2020; Returned: 3/30/2020; Tracking: 73738249; Deliver To: CONSTABLE PCT 1 TAX SUIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION (TAX SUIT); Status: SERVICE RETURNED/UNEXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: RIOJAS, RUSSEL; Issued: 3/26/2020; Returned: 3/30/2020; Tracking: 73738248; Deliver To: CONSTABLE PCT 1 TAX SUIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: RAMIREZ, ANNETTE; Person Filing: ALDINE INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT;

    Read MoreRead Less