This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 10/13/2018 at 09:45:33 (UTC).

ALDINE INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT vs. MOUNTS, DEBORAH L

Case Summary

On 01/29/2016 ALDINE INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT filed a Tax - Other Tax lawsuit against MOUNTS, DEBORAH L. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is KYLE CARTER. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****6017

  • Filing Date:

    01/29/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Other Tax

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

KYLE CARTER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ALDINE INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT

14910 Aldine Westfield Road

Houston, TX 77032

Intervenor Plaintiffs

HARRIS COUNTY FLOOD CONTROL DISTRICT

HARRIS COUNTY EMERGENCY SERVICES DISTRICT # 25

HARRIS COUNTY

LONE STAR COLLEGE SYSTEM DISTRICT

HARRIS COUNTY HOSPITAL DISTRICT

HARRIS COUNTY DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION

HARRIS COUNTY EMERGENCY SERVICES DISTRICT # 01

PORT OF HOUSTON AUTHORITY OF HARRIS COUNTY

Defendant and Intervenor Defendant

MOUNTS, DEBORAH L

Porter, TX 77365

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RAMIREZ, ANNETTE

Intervenor Plaintiff Attorney

PARMAR, PANKA J. R.

 

Court Documents

Exhibit A

01/29/2016: Exhibit A

Civil Process Request

01/29/2016: Civil Process Request

Citation In Delinquent Tax Suit

01/29/2016: Citation In Delinquent Tax Suit

Plaintiffs Original Petition

01/29/2016: Plaintiffs Original Petition

Citation In Delinquent Tax Suit

02/04/2016: Citation In Delinquent Tax Suit

Citation in Delinquent Tax Suit

03/01/2016: Citation in Delinquent Tax Suit

Notice of Change of Attorney in Charge Designation

04/12/2016: Notice of Change of Attorney in Charge Designation

Original Intervention

06/02/2016: Original Intervention

Exhibit "A"

06/16/2016: Exhibit "A"

Civil Process Request: Form 29

06/16/2016: Civil Process Request: Form 29

Aldine Independent School District Vs. Deborah L. MOUNTS Citation In Delinquent Tax Suit

06/16/2016: Aldine Independent School District Vs. Deborah L. MOUNTS Citation In Delinquent Tax Suit

Plaintiffs First Amended Original Petition

06/16/2016: Plaintiffs First Amended Original Petition

Amended Intervention

07/08/2016: Amended Intervention

Citation in Delinquent Tax Suit

07/28/2016: Citation in Delinquent Tax Suit

Defendants Original Answer

08/01/2016: Defendants Original Answer

Proposed Order

08/29/2016: Proposed Order

Final Joint Non-Suit

08/29/2016: Final Joint Non-Suit

DISMISSED ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION

08/31/2016: DISMISSED ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/31/2016
  • Description: NO COSTS ALLOCATED;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2016
  • Description: DISMISSED ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION; Order Signed: 8/31/2016;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2016
  • Description: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Person Filing: MOUNTS, DEBORAH L;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2016
  • Description: AMENDED INTERVENTION; Filing Attorney: PARMAR, PANKA J. R.; Person Filing: LONE STAR COLLEGE SYSTEM DISTRICT;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2016
  • Description: AMENDED INTERVENTION; Filing Attorney: PARMAR, PANKA J. R.; Person Filing: HARRIS COUNTY DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2016
  • Description: AMENDED INTERVENTION; Filing Attorney: PARMAR, PANKA J. R.; Person Filing: HARRIS COUNTY EMERGENCY SERVICES DISTRICT # 01;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2016
  • Description: AMENDED INTERVENTION; Filing Attorney: PARMAR, PANKA J. R.; Person Filing: HARRIS COUNTY EMERGENCY SERVICES DISTRICT # 25;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2016
  • Description: AMENDED INTERVENTION; Filing Attorney: PARMAR, PANKA J. R.; Person Filing: HARRIS COUNTY HOSPITAL DISTRICT;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2016
  • Description: AMENDED INTERVENTION; Filing Attorney: PARMAR, PANKA J. R.; Person Filing: HARRIS COUNTY;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2016
  • Description: AMENDED INTERVENTION; Filing Attorney: PARMAR, PANKA J. R.; Person Filing: HARRIS COUNTY FLOOD CONTROL DISTRICT;

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 06/16/2016
  • Description: FIRST AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: RAMIREZ, ANNETTE; Person Filing: ALDINE INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2016
  • Description: INTERVENTION; Filing Attorney: PARMAR, PANKA J. R.; Person Filing: LONE STAR COLLEGE SYSTEM DISTRICT;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2016
  • Description: INTERVENTION; Filing Attorney: PARMAR, PANKA J. R.; Person Filing: HARRIS COUNTY DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2016
  • Description: INTERVENTION; Filing Attorney: PARMAR, PANKA J. R.; Person Filing: PORT OF HOUSTON AUTHORITY OF HARRIS COUNTY;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2016
  • Description: INTERVENTION; Filing Attorney: PARMAR, PANKA J. R.; Person Filing: HARRIS COUNTY EMERGENCY SERVICES DISTRICT # 25;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2016
  • Description: INTERVENTION; Filing Attorney: PARMAR, PANKA J. R.; Person Filing: HARRIS COUNTY HOSPITAL DISTRICT;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2016
  • Description: INTERVENTION; Filing Attorney: PARMAR, PANKA J. R.; Person Filing: HARRIS COUNTY FLOOD CONTROL DISTRICT;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2016
  • Description: INTERVENTION; Filing Attorney: PARMAR, PANKA J. R.; Person Filing: HARRIS COUNTY EMERGENCY SERVICES DISTRICT # 01;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2016
  • Description: INTERVENTION; Filing Attorney: PARMAR, PANKA J. R.; Person Filing: HARRIS COUNTY;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2016
  • Description: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: FUERTES, SUSAN RAE; Person Filing: ALDINE INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT;

    Read MoreRead Less