This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 10/14/2022 at 07:30:58 (UTC).

ALDINE INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT vs. GD ENERGY PRODUCTS LLC

Case Summary

On 09/20/2022 ALDINE INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT filed a Tax - Other Tax lawsuit against GD ENERGY PRODUCTS LLC. This case was filed in Harris County District Courthouse, Harris County District Courthouse located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is C. ELLIOTT THORNTON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0161

  • Filing Date:

    09/20/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Other Tax

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

C. ELLIOTT THORNTON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ALDINE INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT

Defendant

GD ENERGY PRODUCTS LLC

Other

GD ENERGY PRODUCTS LLC BY SERVING

5444 Westheimer #1000

Houston, TX 77056

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MIDDLETON, KANIKA WALKER

 

Court Documents

PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL PETITION

09/20/2022: PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL PETITION

Aldine Independent School District VS. GD Emergency Productions, LLC Citation In Delinquent Tax Suit

09/20/2022: Aldine Independent School District VS. GD Emergency Productions, LLC Citation In Delinquent Tax Suit

Civil Process Request: Service Form 29

09/20/2022: Civil Process Request: Service Form 29

Exhibit A

09/20/2022: Exhibit A

Citation in Delinquent Tax Suit

09/29/2022: Citation in Delinquent Tax Suit

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/20/2022
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION (TAX SUIT); Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: GD ENERGY PRODUCTS LLC BY SERVING; Issued: 9/20/2022; Served: 9/27/2022; Returned: 9/28/2022; Received: 9/29/2022; Tracking: 74054219; Deliver To: CONSTABLE PCT 1 TAX SUIT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: MIDDLETON, KANIKA WALKER; Person Filing: ALDINE INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ALDINE INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT is a litigant