This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 11/21/2022 at 07:29:24 (UTC).

ALDINE INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT vs. CARMOCAN, KAREN

Case Summary

On 10/28/2022 ALDINE INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT filed a Tax - Other Tax lawsuit against CARMOCAN, KAREN. This case was filed in Harris County District Courthouse, Harris County District Courthouse located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is LAUREN REEDER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0728

  • Filing Date:

    10/28/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Other Tax

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

LAUREN REEDER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ALDINE INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT

Defendants

CARMOCAN, KAREN

Houston, TX 77088

CARMOCAN, DAN

Houston, TX 77088

PRIMEWAY FEDERAL CREDIT UNION (IN REM ONLY)

HARRIS COUNTY

HARRIS COUNTY EDUCATION DEPARTMENT

PORT OF HOUSTON OF HARRIS COUNTY AUTHORITY

HARRIS COUNTY FLOOD CONTROL

AND THE HARRIS COUNTY HOSPITAL DISTRICT

LONE STAR COLLEGE SYSTEM DISTRICT

CITY OF HOUSTON

Other

PRIMEWAY FEDERAL CREDIT UNION BY SERVING ANNETTE ZIMMERMAN MANAGER

12811 Northwest Freeway

Houston, TX 77040

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WALTERS, PAMELA H

 

Court Documents

EXHIBIT A

10/28/2022: EXHIBIT A

Civil process request: SERVICE FORM 29

10/28/2022: Civil process request: SERVICE FORM 29

CITATION IN DELINQUENT TAX SUIT

10/28/2022: CITATION IN DELINQUENT TAX SUIT

CITATION IN DELINQUENT TAX SUIT

10/28/2022: CITATION IN DELINQUENT TAX SUIT

Citation In Delinquent Tax Suit

10/28/2022: Citation In Delinquent Tax Suit

PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL PETITION

10/28/2022: PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL PETITION

Citation in Delinquent Tax Suit

11/02/2022: Citation in Delinquent Tax Suit

Citation in Delinquent Tax Suit

11/02/2022: Citation in Delinquent Tax Suit

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/28/2022
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION (TAX SUIT); Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: CARMOCAN, DAN; Issued: 10/28/2022; Served: 11/1/2022; Returned: 11/1/2022; Tracking: 74070960; Deliver To: CONSTABLE PCT 1 TAX SUIT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION (TAX SUIT); Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: CARMOCAN, KAREN; Issued: 10/28/2022; Served: 11/1/2022; Returned: 11/1/2022; Tracking: 74070958; Deliver To: CONSTABLE PCT 1 TAX SUIT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION (TAX SUIT); Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: PRIMEWAY FEDERAL CREDIT UNION BY SERVING ANNETTE ZIMMERMAN MANAGER; Issued: 10/28/2022; Served: 11/14/2022; Returned: 11/15/2022; Tracking: 74070957; Deliver To: CONSTABLE PCT 1 TAX SUIT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: WALTERS, PAMELA H; Person Filing: ALDINE INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PRIMEWAY FEDERAL CREDIT UNION is a litigant

Latest cases where PORT OF HOUSTON OF HARRIS COUNTY AUTHORITY is a litigant

Latest cases where ALDINE INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT is a litigant

Latest cases where Lone Star College System is a litigant