This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 09/25/2018 at 14:24:29 (UTC).

ALDINE INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT vs. BECERRA, TOMAS G (D/B/A RAINBOW FISH)

Case Summary

On 01/26/2016 ALDINE INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT filed a Tax - Other Tax lawsuit against BECERRA, TOMAS G D/B/A RAINBOW FISH. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is R K SANDILL. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****4933

  • Filing Date:

    01/26/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Other Tax

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

R K SANDILL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ALDINE INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT

14910 Aldine Westfield Road

Houston, TX 77032

Intervenor Plaintiffs

HARRIS COUNTY FLOOD CONTROL DISTRICT

HARRIS COUNTY EMERGENCY SERVICES DISTRICT # 25

HARRIS COUNTY

LONE STAR COLLEGE SYSTEM DISTRICT

HARRIS COUNTY HOSPITAL DISTRICT

HARRIS COUNTY DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION

HARRIS COUNTY EMERGENCY SERVICES DISTRICT # 01

PORT OF HOUSTON AUTHORITY OF HARRIS COUNTY

Defendants and Intervenor Defendants

RAINBOW FISH

Houston, TX 77039

FONSECA, ENEDINA H (D/B/A RAINBOW FISH)

Houston, TX 77039

BECERRA, TOMAS G (D/B/A RAINBOW FISH)

Houston, TX 77039

BECERRA, THOMAS G (DBA RAINBOW FISH)

Houston, TX 77039

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RAMIREZ, ANNETTE

Intervenor Plaintiff Attorney

PARMAR, PANKA J. R.

 

Court Documents

Civil Process Request

01/26/2016: Civil Process Request

Plaintiff's Original Petition

01/26/2016: Plaintiff's Original Petition

Citation in Delinquent Tax Suit

05/12/2016: Citation in Delinquent Tax Suit

EXHIBIT A

05/18/2016: EXHIBIT A

Civil Process Request: service form 29

05/18/2016: Civil Process Request: service form 29

PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED PETITION

05/18/2016: PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED PETITION

Exhibit A

02/17/2017: Exhibit A

Civil Process Request

02/17/2017: Civil Process Request

Citation in Delinquent Tax Suit

02/17/2017: Citation in Delinquent Tax Suit

Plaintiff's Second Amended Original Petition

02/17/2017: Plaintiff's Second Amended Original Petition

Declaration of Michael Johnson of Due Diligence

03/08/2017: Declaration of Michael Johnson of Due Diligence

Declaration of Michael Johnson of Due Diligence

03/08/2017: Declaration of Michael Johnson of Due Diligence

Return of Service/FONSECA, ENEDINA H (D/B/A RAINBOW FISH)

03/31/2017: Return of Service/FONSECA, ENEDINA H (D/B/A RAINBOW FISH)

Return of Service/BECERRA, TOMAS G (D/B/A RAINBOW FISH)

03/31/2017: Return of Service/BECERRA, TOMAS G (D/B/A RAINBOW FISH)

Notice of Default by Submission

09/18/2017: Notice of Default by Submission

Non-Military Affidavit

09/18/2017: Non-Military Affidavit

Certificate of Last Known Address

09/18/2017: Certificate of Last Known Address

Notice Of Activity

10/31/2017: Notice Of Activity

23 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/29/2017
  • Description: DEFENDANT COSTS;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2017
  • Description: DEFAULT JUDGMENT SIGNED; Order Signed: 10/29/2017;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2017
  • Description: SECOND AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: RAMIREZ, ANNETTE; Person Filing: ALDINE INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2016
  • Description: FIRST AMENDED INTERVENTION; Filing Attorney: PARMAR, PANKA J. R.; Person Filing: HARRIS COUNTY;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2016
  • Description: FIRST AMENDED INTERVENTION; Filing Attorney: PARMAR, PANKA J. R.; Person Filing: HARRIS COUNTY EMERGENCY SERVICES DISTRICT # 01;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2016
  • Description: FIRST AMENDED INTERVENTION; Filing Attorney: PARMAR, PANKA J. R.; Person Filing: HARRIS COUNTY EMERGENCY SERVICES DISTRICT # 25;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2016
  • Description: FIRST AMENDED INTERVENTION; Filing Attorney: PARMAR, PANKA J. R.; Person Filing: HARRIS COUNTY HOSPITAL DISTRICT;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2016
  • Description: FIRST AMENDED INTERVENTION; Filing Attorney: PARMAR, PANKA J. R.; Person Filing: HARRIS COUNTY DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2016
  • Description: FIRST AMENDED INTERVENTION; Filing Attorney: PARMAR, PANKA J. R.; Person Filing: LONE STAR COLLEGE SYSTEM DISTRICT;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2016
  • Description: FIRST AMENDED INTERVENTION; Filing Attorney: PARMAR, PANKA J. R.; Person Filing: HARRIS COUNTY FLOOD CONTROL DISTRICT;

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 05/18/2016
  • Description: FIRST AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: RAMIREZ, ANNETTE; Person Filing: ALDINE INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2016
  • Description: INTERVENTION; Filing Attorney: PARMAR, PANKA J. R.; Person Filing: HARRIS COUNTY;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2016
  • Description: INTERVENTION; Filing Attorney: PARMAR, PANKA J. R.; Person Filing: HARRIS COUNTY HOSPITAL DISTRICT;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2016
  • Description: INTERVENTION; Filing Attorney: PARMAR, PANKA J. R.; Person Filing: HARRIS COUNTY EMERGENCY SERVICES DISTRICT # 25;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2016
  • Description: INTERVENTION; Filing Attorney: PARMAR, PANKA J. R.; Person Filing: HARRIS COUNTY EMERGENCY SERVICES DISTRICT # 01;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2016
  • Description: INTERVENTION; Filing Attorney: PARMAR, PANKA J. R.; Person Filing: HARRIS COUNTY DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2016
  • Description: INTERVENTION; Filing Attorney: PARMAR, PANKA J. R.; Person Filing: LONE STAR COLLEGE SYSTEM DISTRICT;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2016
  • Description: INTERVENTION; Filing Attorney: PARMAR, PANKA J. R.; Person Filing: HARRIS COUNTY FLOOD CONTROL DISTRICT;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2016
  • Description: INTERVENTION; Filing Attorney: PARMAR, PANKA J. R.; Person Filing: PORT OF HOUSTON AUTHORITY OF HARRIS COUNTY;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2016
  • Description: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: RAMIREZ, ANNETTE; Person Filing: ALDINE INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT;

    Read MoreRead Less