This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 06/24/2015 at 12:09:29 (UTC).

ALCORN, JOSEPH L JR vs. TOPETE, TIMMY JR

Case Summary

On 08/30/2004 ALCORN, JOSEPH L JR filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against TOPETE, TIMMY JR. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****7559

  • Filing Date:

    08/30/2004

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ALCORN, JOSEPH L JR

Defendants

TOPETE, TIMMY JR

TOWER PLUMBING INC (TEXAS CORPORATION)

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BUNCH, RICKEY G.

Defendant Attorney

BALDWIN, SAMUEL R. JR.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/07/2005
  • EACH PAY OWN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2005
  • DISMISSED ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2005
  • HOLD FOR JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2005
  • ORDER SIGNED GRANTING TRIAL CONTINUANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2004
  • DESIGNATED TRIAL READY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2004
  • JURY DEMAND MADE (TRCP 216)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2004
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - BALDWIN, SAMUEL R. JR. Person Filing - TOPETE, TIMMY JR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2004
  • JURY FEE PAID (TRCP 216)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2004
  • ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - BUNCH, RICKEY G. Person Filing - ALCORN, JOSEPH L JR

    Read MoreRead Less