This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 06/18/2015 at 23:01:29 (UTC).

ALANIZ, ESTANISLADO vs. EXXON MOBIL CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 12/02/2004 ALANIZ, ESTANISLADO filed an Other - Complex Tort/Class Action lawsuit against EXXON MOBIL CORPORATION. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****4451

  • Filing Date:

    12/02/2004

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Complex Tort/Class Action

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ALANIZ, ESTANISLADO

Defendants

EXXON MOBIL CORPORATION

INGERSOLL RAND COMPANY

ABLE SUPPLY COMPANY

AMERICAN STANDARD INC

AQUA-CHEM INC

A W CHESTERTON

BABCOCK BORSIG POWER INC

BECHTEL CONSTRUCTION COMPANY

BECHTEL CORPORATION

BUFFALO PUMPS INC

CERTAINTEED CORPORATION

CRANE CO

CROWN CORK & SEAL

DANA CORPORATION

DURABLA MANUFACTURING COMPANY INC

EXXON MOBILE

EXXON MOBILE CORPORATION

EXXON MOBILE OIL CORPORATION

FLUOR CORPORATION

26 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WATHEN, FRANK J. II

Defendant Attorneys

FRASE, LAURA ANN

WHITE, CLAY M.

HUEBER, SUSAN JAN

POWERS, JAMES H.

LOWERY, JAMES A. III

ADAMS, KENT M.

Other Attorneys

PRAZAK, JONATHAN R

ELLISTON, GARY D.

IRVIN, JASON JAMES

HUNTER, HAROLD HARVEY

BOYD, ERNEST W

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/10/2015
  • NO COSTS ALLOCATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2015
  • ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSED BY COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2013
  • NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, PARTIAL (RULE 162)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2008
  • ORDER SIGNED SUBSTITUTING ATTORNEY OF RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2008
  • NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, PARTIAL (RULE 162)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2006
  • ANSWER SECOND AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - POWERS, JAMES H. Person Filing - BUFFALO PUMPS INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2005
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - WHITE, CLAY M. Person Filing - AQUA-CHEM INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2005
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - BALDO, NICHOLAS S. Person Filing - OAKFABCO INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2005
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - FULLER, L. HAYES III Person Filing - GOULDS PUMPS INCORPORATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2005
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - ELLISTON, GARY D. Person Filing - KAISER GYPSUM COMPANY INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2005
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - ADAMS, KENT M. Person Filing - FLUOR CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2005
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - MOIR, PETER A. Person Filing - OWENS-ILLINOIS INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2005
  • MOTION TRANSFER VENUE : Filing Attorney - BOYD, ERNEST W Person Filing - SEPCO CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2005
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - BOYD, ERNEST W Person Filing - SEPCO CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2005
  • NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, PARTIAL (RULE 162)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2005
  • ANSWER SECOND AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - POWERS, JAMES H. Person Filing - CERTAINTEED CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2004
  • ANSWER SECOND AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - FRASE, LAURA ANN Person Filing - INGERSOLL RAND COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2004
  • ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - SMITH, J. MARK Person Filing - ALANIZ, ESTANISLADO

    Read MoreRead Less