This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 09/22/2018 at 16:50:13 (UTC).

AHMED, FARAZ (INDIVIDUALLY AND DBA ANOSH vs. BALOCH, NAWAB F (INDIVIDUALLY AND DBA PI

Case Summary

On 01/15/2016 AHMED, FARAZ INDIVIDUALLY AND DBA ANOSH filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against BALOCH, NAWAB F INDIVIDUALLY AND DBA PI. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judges overseeing this case are MICHAEL D. MILLER and KRISTEN BRAUCHLE HAWKINS. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****2891

  • Filing Date:

    01/15/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judges

MICHAEL D. MILLER

KRISTEN BRAUCHLE HAWKINS

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

ANOSH INC

AHMED, FARAZ

AHMED, FARAZ (INDIVIDUALLY AND DBA ANOSH INC)

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

BALOCH, NAWAB F (INDIVIDUALLY AND DBA PINNACLE RESEARCH LLC)

Houston, TX 77096

PINNACLE RESEARCH LLC

9002 Chimney Rock Suite G388

Houston, TX 77096

AHMED, SAROSH

Other

PINNACLE RESEARCH LLC MAY BE SERVED WITH PROCESS THROUGH ITS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorneys

LONGACRE, ANISSAH MARIE

ANDANG, ANISSAH MARIE

Cross Plaintiff Attorney

TAGTMEIER, BRIAN JAMES

 

Court Documents

Civil Process Request Form

01/15/2016: Civil Process Request Form

Case Information Sheet

01/15/2016: Case Information Sheet

PLAINTIFFS ORIGINAL PETITION

01/15/2016: PLAINTIFFS ORIGINAL PETITION

Exhibit A-7

02/04/2016: Exhibit A-7

Exhibit A-6

02/04/2016: Exhibit A-6

Exhibit A-4

02/04/2016: Exhibit A-4

Exhibit A-3

02/04/2016: Exhibit A-3

Exhibit A-2

02/04/2016: Exhibit A-2

Exhibit A-1

02/04/2016: Exhibit A-1

Defendants Nawab F. Baloch and Pinnacle Research LLC's Original Answer, Plea to the Jurisdiction, Counterclaim Against Anosh, Inc. and Anosh Ahmed and Request for Disclosure

02/04/2016: Defendants Nawab F. Baloch and Pinnacle Research LLC's Original Answer, Plea to the Jurisdiction, Counterclaim Against Anosh, Inc. and Anosh Ahmed and Request for Disclosure

Plaintiff & Counter Defendant Anosh Incs Original Answer to Counter Plaintiff Pinnacle Research LLCs Counterclaim

02/29/2016: Plaintiff & Counter Defendant Anosh Incs Original Answer to Counter Plaintiff Pinnacle Research LLCs Counterclaim

Proposed Order

05/13/2016: Proposed Order

Notice of Submission

05/13/2016: Notice of Submission

Plaintiff's Special Exception to Defendant's Original Answer

05/13/2016: Plaintiff's Special Exception to Defendant's Original Answer

Plaintiff and Counter-Defendant Anosh, Inc.'s Amended Original Petition

05/16/2016: Plaintiff and Counter-Defendant Anosh, Inc.'s Amended Original Petition

Proposed Order

11/15/2016: Proposed Order

ORDER OF PARTIAL NONSUIT SIGNED

11/21/2016: ORDER OF PARTIAL NONSUIT SIGNED

RETURN MAIL UNDELIVERABLE

12/19/2016: RETURN MAIL UNDELIVERABLE

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/21/2016
  • Description: EACH PAY OWN;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2016
  • Description: ORDER OF PARTIAL NONSUIT SIGNED; Order Signed: 11/21/2016;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2016
  • Description: DISMISSED ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION; Order Signed: 11/21/2016;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2016
  • Description: SECOND AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: ANDANG, ANISSAH MARIE; Person Filing: ANOSH INC;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2016
  • Description: DOCKET CONTROL/PRETRIAL ORDER SIGNED; Order Signed: 3/31/2016;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2016
  • Description: DESIGNATED TRIAL READY;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2016
  • Description: FIRST AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: ANDANG, ANISSAH MARIE; Person Filing: ANOSH INC;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/29/2016
  • Description: ANSWER COUNTER CLAIM; Filing Attorney: ANDANG, ANISSAH MARIE; Person Filing: ANOSH INC;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/29/2016
  • Description: ANSWER COUNTER CLAIM; Filing Attorney: ANDANG, ANISSAH MARIE; Person Filing: ANOSH INC;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2016
  • Description: COUNTER CLAIM; Filing Attorney: TAGTMEIER, BRIAN JAMES; Person Filing: PINNACLE RESEARCH LLC;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2016
  • Description: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: ANDANG, ANISSAH MARIE; Person Filing: AHMED, FARAZ;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2016
  • Description: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: ANDANG, ANISSAH MARIE; Person Filing: ANOSH INC;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2016
  • Description: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: ANDANG, ANISSAH MARIE; Person Filing: AHMED, FARAZ (INDIVIDUALLY AND DBA ANOSH INC);

    Read MoreRead Less