This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 06/19/2020 at 07:22:49 (UTC).

AHMED, ASHFAQ vs. GEICO COUNTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 05/26/2020 AHMED, ASHFAQ filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against GEICO COUNTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is URSULA A. HALL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****1459

  • Filing Date:

    05/26/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

URSULA A. HALL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AHMED, ASHFAQ

Defendant

GEICO COUNTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Other

GEICO COUNTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY (A FOREIGN COMPANY) MAY BE

D2280 N Greenville Ave

Richardson, TX 75082

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BAKKER, KEITH NICOLAAS

 

Court Documents

Citation

06/09/2020: Citation

PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL PETITION AND REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURE

05/26/2020: PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL PETITION AND REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURE

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/26/2020
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: GEICO COUNTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY (A FOREIGN COMPANY) MAY BE; Issued: 5/26/2020; Served: 6/3/2020; Tracking: 73752738; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: BAKKER, KEITH NICOLAAS; Person Filing: AHMED, ASHFAQ;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • DocketDescription: JURY FEE PAID (TRCP 216);

    Read MoreRead Less