This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 09/26/2021 at 07:37:01 (UTC).

ADVANTAGE BUSINESS CAPITAL INC vs. HOLCIM (US) INC LLC

Case Summary

On 09/02/2021 ADVANTAGE BUSINESS CAPITAL INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against HOLCIM US INC LLC. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is RABEEA COLLIER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****6468

  • Filing Date:

    09/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

RABEEA COLLIER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ADVANTAGE BUSINESS CAPITAL INC

Defendant

HOLCIM (US) INC LLC

Other

HOLCIM (US) INC (A DELAWARE CORPORATION) MAY BE SERVED BY SERVING ITS

1999 Bryan Street Ste 900

Dallas, TX 75201

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SCHOBER, TERESA RUIZ

 

Court Documents

Citation Corporate

09/10/2021: Citation Corporate

EXHIBIT G

09/02/2021: EXHIBIT G

EXHIBIT F

09/02/2021: EXHIBIT F

EXHIBIT E

09/02/2021: EXHIBIT E

EXHIBIT D

09/02/2021: EXHIBIT D

EXHIBIT C

09/02/2021: EXHIBIT C

EXHIBIT B

09/02/2021: EXHIBIT B

EXHIBIT A

09/02/2021: EXHIBIT A

PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL PETITION

09/02/2021: PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL PETITION

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/02/2021
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION CORPORATE; Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HOLCIM (US) INC (A DELAWARE CORPORATION) MAY BE SERVED BY SERVING ITS; Issued: 9/3/2021; Served: 9/8/2021; Received: 9/10/2021; Tracking: 73911718; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: SCHOBER, TERESA RUIZ; Person Filing: ADVANTAGE BUSINESS CAPITAL INC;

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Holcim (US) Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SCHOBER, TERESA RUIZ