This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 02/23/2023 at 07:19:19 (UTC).

ABREU-VEGA, LAZARO vs. MARTINEZ, ALEX SALVADOR

Case Summary

On 01/30/2023 ABREU-VEGA, LAZARO filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against MARTINEZ, ALEX SALVADOR. This case was filed in Harris County District Courthouse, Harris County District Courthouse located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is FREDERICKA PHILLIPS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****5741

  • Filing Date:

    01/30/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

FREDERICKA PHILLIPS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ABREU-VEGA, LAZARO

Defendants

MARTINEZ, ALEX SALVADOR

NATIONAL FREIGHT INC

CAL CARTAGE TRANSPORTATION EXPRESS LLC

CALIFORNIA CARTAGE TRANSPORTATION LLC

Others

NATIONAL FREIGHT INC (A FOREIGN CORPORATION) MAY BE SERVED BY SERVING

CALIFORNIA CARTAGE TRANSPORTATION LLC (A FOREIGN CORPORATION) MAY BE

CAL CARTAGE TRANSPORTATION EXPRESS LLC (A FOREIGN CORPORATION) MAY BE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MONTES, HUGO RENE GRANADOS

 

Court Documents

Plaintiff's Original Petition

01/30/2023: Plaintiff's Original Petition

Citation Return - Alex Salvador Martinez

02/06/2023: Citation Return - Alex Salvador Martinez

Affidavit of Service - National Freight, Inc

02/10/2023: Affidavit of Service - National Freight, Inc

Affidavit of Service - California Cartage Transportation, LLC

02/10/2023: Affidavit of Service - California Cartage Transportation, LLC

Affidavit of Service - Cal Cartage Transportation Express, LLC

02/10/2023: Affidavit of Service - Cal Cartage Transportation Express, LLC

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/30/2023
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: MARTINEZ, ALEX SALVADOR; Issued: 2/1/2023; Served: 2/4/2023; Tracking: 74105964; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION CORPORATE; Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: CAL CARTAGE TRANSPORTATION EXPRESS LLC (A FOREIGN CORPORATION) MAY BE; Issued: 2/1/2023; Served: 2/3/2023; Tracking: 74105960; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION CORPORATE; Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: CALIFORNIA CARTAGE TRANSPORTATION LLC (A FOREIGN CORPORATION) MAY BE; Issued: 2/1/2023; Served: 2/3/2023; Tracking: 74105959; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION CORPORATE; Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: NATIONAL FREIGHT INC (A FOREIGN CORPORATION) MAY BE SERVED BY SERVING; Issued: 2/1/2023; Served: 2/3/2023; Tracking: 74105958; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: MONTES, HUGO RENE GRANADOS; Person Filing: ABREU-VEGA, LAZARO;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • DocketDescription: JURY FEE PAID (TRCP 216);

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less