This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 04/15/2022 at 07:39:09 (UTC).

ABAD, MARGARITA vs. PETSMART INC

Case Summary

On 03/22/2022 ABAD, MARGARITA filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against PETSMART INC. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is DAWN ROGERS. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****7329

  • Filing Date:

    03/22/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

DAWN ROGERS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ABAD, MARGARITA

Defendants

PETSMART INC

PETSMART LLC

Other

PETSMART INC (CORPORATION) BY SERVING ITS REGISTERED AGENT

5444 Westheimer #1000

Houston, TX 77056

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

STRAUS, SOFIA

Defendant Attorney

LUCK, WILLIAM H. JR.

 

Court Documents

Plaintiffs Original Petition

03/22/2022: Plaintiffs Original Petition

Request for Issuance of Service

03/22/2022: Request for Issuance of Service

DEFENDANTS ORIGINAL ANSWER

04/08/2022: DEFENDANTS ORIGINAL ANSWER

Notice of Removal

04/08/2022: Notice of Removal

Exhibit 1 - Notice of Removal

04/08/2022: Exhibit 1 - Notice of Removal

Return of Service-PetSmart Inc

03/29/2022: Return of Service-PetSmart Inc

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/08/2022
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: LUCK, WILLIAM H. JR.; Person Filing: PETSMART INC;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • DocketDescription: JURY FEE PAID (TRCP 216);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • DocketDescription: JURY FEE PAID (TRCP 216);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • DocketDescription: REMOVED TO FEDERAL COURT;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION CORPORATE; Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: PETSMART INC (CORPORATION) BY SERVING ITS REGISTERED AGENT; Issued: 3/23/2022; Served: 3/24/2022; Received: 3/29/2022; Tracking: 73986676; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: STRAUS, SOFIA; Person Filing: ABAD, MARGARITA;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • DocketDescription: JURY FEE PAID (TRCP 216);

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PACIFIC COAST DISTRIBUTING INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Luck, William H, Jr