Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 05/15/2015 at 20:41:16 (UTC).

6550 MAPLERIDGE LLC vs. BEHAVIORAL HOSPITAL OF BELLAIRE LLC

Case Summary

On 07/08/2011 6550 MAPLERIDGE LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against BEHAVIORAL HOSPITAL OF BELLAIRE LLC. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0630

  • Filing Date:

    07/08/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

6550 MAPLERIDGE LLC

Defendants

BEHAVIORAL HOSPITAL OF BELLAIRE LLC

MAXIM MANAGEMENT GROUP LLC

ASCEND HEALTH CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SAIKIN, JONATHAN

Defendant Attorneys

PULMAN, RANDALL ALAN

NELSON, EMILY J

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/17/2012
  • NO COSTS ALLOCATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2012
  • DISMISSED ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2011
  • DESIGNATED TRIAL READY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2011
  • ORDER GRANTING APPEARANCE PRO HAC VICE SIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2011
  • FIRST AMENDED ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - PULLEN, ERIC A. Person Filing - MAXIM MANAGEMENT GROUP LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2011
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - STEWARD, SARAH PHILENA Person Filing - ASCEND HEALTH CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2011
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - PULMAN, RANDALL ALAN Person Filing - BEHAVIORAL HOSPITAL OF BELLAIRE LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2011
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - PULMAN, RANDALL ALAN Person Filing - MAXIM MANAGEMENT GROUP LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2011
  • ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - SAIKIN, JONATHAN Person Filing - 6550 MAPLERIDGE LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Maxim Management Group, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer NELSON, EMILY JOANNA