This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 10/18/2020 at 07:22:03 (UTC).

2500 CITYWEST BLVD LLC vs. HARRIS COUNTY APPRAISAL DISTRICT

Case Summary

On 09/23/2020 2500 CITYWEST BLVD LLC filed a Tax - Other Tax lawsuit against HARRIS COUNTY APPRAISAL DISTRICT. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is JACLANEL M. MCFARLAND. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****9171

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Other Tax

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

JACLANEL M. MCFARLAND

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

2500 CITYWEST BLVD LLC

Defendant

HARRIS COUNTY APPRAISAL DISTRICT

Other

HARRIS COUNTY APPRAISAL DISTRICT MAY BE SERVED WITH PROCESS BY SERVING

13013 Northwest Freeway

Houston, TX 77040

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DONOVAN, KATHLEEN FAYE

Defendant Attorney

OUSLANDER, COREY R

 

Court Documents

Citation

10/06/2020: Citation

Defendant's Original Answer and Request For Disclosure

10/16/2020: Defendant's Original Answer and Request For Disclosure

REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SERVICE

09/23/2020: REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SERVICE

PLAINTIFFS ORIGINAL PETITION

09/23/2020: PLAINTIFFS ORIGINAL PETITION

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/16/2020
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: OUSLANDER, COREY R; Person Filing: HARRIS COUNTY APPRAISAL DISTRICT;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HARRIS COUNTY APPRAISAL DISTRICT MAY BE SERVED WITH PROCESS BY SERVING; Issued: 9/24/2020; Served: 9/28/2020; Tracking: 73792042; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: DONOVAN, KATHLEEN FAYE; Person Filing: 2500 CITYWEST BLVD LLC;

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HARRIS COUNTY APPRAISAL DISTRICT is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer OUSLANDER, COREY ROBERT