Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Harris County Courts on 03/16/2017 at 00:38:20 (UTC).

XAVIER HILL ET AL. VS. SHELLEY BOWIE

Case Summary

On 09/16/2014 XAVIER HILL filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against SHELLEY BOWIE. This case was filed in Harris County Courts, Harris County Civil Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is ROBERTA LLOYD. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***3003

  • Filing Date:

    09/16/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Harris County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Civil Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

ROBERTA LLOYD

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

HILL XAVIER

HILL CHANNING

CHANNING HILL

XAVIER HILL

Defendants

BOWIE SHELLEY

SHELLEY BOWIE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

SCOTT LEROY B

10100 N Central Expy #500

Dallas, TX 75231

CATLETT DEBRA JO

Attorney at CATLETT & ASSOCIATES, P.C.

907 Harold

Houston, TX 77006

CATLETT, DEBRA JO

907 Harold

Houston, TX 77006

SCOTT, LEROY B

10100 N Central Expy #500

Dallas, TX 75231

Defendant Attorneys

HARLIN III DAVID LLOYD

5752 Bost Club Road Suite 400

Fort Worth, TX 76179

HARLIN III, DAVID LLOYD

5752 Bost Club Road Suite 400

Fort Worth, TX 76179

 

Court Documents

Answer

Answer: DEFENDANT'S ORIGINAL ANSWER Film code number CCCL-2014-310854

Order to Appoint Guardian Ad Litem

Order to Appoint Guardian Ad Litem

Order Granted

Order Granted: GUARDIAN AD LITEM FEE SHEET Film code number CCCL-2015-26638

Final Judgment and Notice After Non-Jury Trial

Final Judgment and Notice After Non-Jury Trial

Final Judgment and Notice After Non-Jury Trial

Final Judgment and Notice After Non-Jury Trial

Final Judgment and Notice After Non-Jury Trial

Final Judgment and Notice After Non-Jury Trial

Letter

Letter: FROM TREY HARLIN Film code number CCCL-2015-51570

Letter

Letter: FROM TREY HARLIN Film code number CCCL-2015-51571

Funds to Registry of Court

Funds to Registry of Court: DEPOSIT $9412.20 TO BE DEPOSITED INTO THE REGISTRY OF THE COURT (FUBO) CHANNING HILL Film code number CCCL-2015-50962

Civil Case Information Sheet

Civil Case Information Sheet

Cover Letter

Cover Letter

Motion

Motion: MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM Film code number CCCL-2014-334122

Crt 4-Order for Trial Setting-NonJury

Crt 4-Order for Trial Setting-NonJury

Order Not Entered

Order Not Entered: GUARDIAN AD LITEM FEE ORDER NOT SIGNED Film code number CCCL-2014-336470

Notice of Hearing

Notice of Hearing: MINOR SETTLEMENT Film code number CCCL-2014-425383

Letter

Letter: FROM TREY HARLIN Film code number CCCL-2015-51572

Funds to Registry of Court

Funds to Registry of Court: TO BE DEPOSITED INTO THE REGISTRY OF THE COURT FUBO CHANNING HILL $645.00 Film code number CCCL-2015-85698

Affidavit of Check Disbursement

Affidavit of Check Disbursement

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Affidavit of Check Disbursement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Certificate of Withdrawal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Order to Withdraw Funds

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2015
  • Court Registry Deposit: Deposit made for $645.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Funds to Registry of Court: TO BE DEPOSITED INTO THE REGISTRY OF THE COURT FUBO CHANNING HILL $645.00 Film code number CCCL-2015-85698

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Judgment: FINAL JUDGMENT IN FAVOR OF PLAINTIFF Film code number CCCL-2015-50998

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2015
  • Court Registry Deposit: Deposit made for $9412.20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Funds to Registry of Court: DEPOSIT $9412.20 TO BE DEPOSITED INTO THE REGISTRY OF THE COURT (FUBO) CHANNING HILL Film code number CCCL-2015-50962

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2015
  • RECEIPT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Letter: FROM TREY HARLIN Film code number CCCL-2015-51572

    Read MoreRead Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 09/16/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Answer: DEFENDANT'S ORIGINAL ANSWER Film code number CCCL-2014-310854

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2014
  • Attorney Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2014
  • RECEIPT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2014
  • Attorney Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2014
  • Attorney Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Cover Letter

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Information Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2014
  • Electronic Filing Fee: MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM, AGREED ORDER APPOINTING, DEFENDANTS ANSWER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2014
  • RECEIVABLE GENERATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Initiation Event (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less