This case was last updated from Harris County Courts on 06/11/2020 at 18:29:58 (UTC).

WOODGLEN VILLAGE LP VS KAYLA CRIDELL

Case Summary

On 12/06/2019 WOODGLEN VILLAGE LP filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against KAYLA CRIDELL. This case was filed in Harris County Courts, Harris County Civil Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is LASHAWN WILLIAMS. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***6663

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Harris County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Civil Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

LASHAWN WILLIAMS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Woodglen Village LP

C/O Camelia Roberts 11111 W. Montgomery Rd

Houston, TX 77088

Defendant

Kayla Cridell

Houston, TX 77088

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FOURNIER, SCOTT H

3311 Richmond Ave. Suite 305

Houston, TX 77098

 

Court Documents

Exhibit List

Exhibit List

Certificate of Withdrawal

Certificate of Withdrawal

Writ of Property Possession Returned

Writ of Property Possession Returned: Served

Request WRIT from County.pdf

Writ of Possession to be Issued

Writ of Possession on Property (Court Judgment)

Writ of Property Possession Issued: HOLD FOR CONSTABLE PICK UP

Final Judgment and Notice After Non-Jury Trial

Final Judgment and Notice After Non-Jury Trial

Final Judgment and Notice After Non-Jury Trial

Final Judgment and Notice After Non-Jury Trial

Final Judgment and Notice After Non-Jury Trial

Final Judgment and Notice After Non-Jury Trial

Order to Withdraw Funds

Order to Withdraw Funds

JP Citation Returned

JP Citation Returned

JP Judgment

JP Judgment

JP Notice

JP Notice: OF ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION IN AN EVICTION PROCEEDING

JP Request for Appeal

JP Request for Appeal

JP Affidavit of Inability to Pay Costs for Appeal

JP Affidavit of Inability to Pay Costs for Appeal

JP Notice

JP Notice: OF FILING STATEMENT OF INABILITY TO AFFORD PAYMENT OF COSTS TO APPEAL AN EVICTION JUDGMENT

JP Notice

JP Notice: OF FILING APPEAL BOND OR STATEMENT OF INABILITY TO AFFORD PAYMENT OF COSTS TO APPEAL A JUDGMENT IN A NON-PAYMENT OF RENT EVICTION

Transcript from Justice of the Peace Court

Transcript from Justice of the Peace Court

JP Index

JP Index

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Withdrawal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketExhibit List

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWrit of Property Possession Returned: Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWrit of Property Possession Issued: HOLD FOR CONSTABLE PICK UP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWrit of Possession to be Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • DocketFunds to Registry of Court: DEPOSIT JP APPEAL # 191100434662 RECEIPT # 2019-200 $ 917.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFinal Judgment and Notice After Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Withdraw Funds

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Appearance: PLAINTIFF S NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate: FIRST AMENDED CERTIFICATE OF LAST KNOWN ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJP Citation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJP Citation Returned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJP Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJP Notice: OF ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION IN AN EVICTION PROCEEDING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJP Request for Appeal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJP Affidavit of Inability to Pay Costs for Appeal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJP Notice: OF FILING STATEMENT OF INABILITY TO AFFORD PAYMENT OF COSTS TO APPEAL AN EVICTION JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJP Notice: OF FILING APPEAL BOND OR STATEMENT OF INABILITY TO AFFORD PAYMENT OF COSTS TO APPEAL A JUDGMENT IN A NON-PAYMENT OF RENT EVICTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTranscript from Justice of the Peace Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJP Index

    Read MoreRead Less