This case was last updated from Harris County Courts on 02/27/2020 at 14:35:02 (UTC).

WILMINGTON SAVINGS FUND SOCIETY, FSB VS SALEM HEARD

Case Summary

On 12/05/2019 WILMINGTON SAVINGS FUND SOCIETY, FSB filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against SALEM HEARD. This case was filed in Harris County Courts, Harris County Civil Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is LASHAWN WILLIAMS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***6571

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Harris County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Civil Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

LASHAWN WILLIAMS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Wilmington Savings Fund Society, Fsb

Defendant

Salem Heard

Humble, TX 77396

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PETERSON, ERIC S

275 W. Campbell Suite 312

Richardson, TX 75080

 

Court Documents

Lead_Summons_eABC_filing_package.pdf

Return of Service

Lead_Motion_eABC_filing_package.pdf

Motion for Substituted Service

Lead_Motion_eABC_filing_package.pdf

Order for Rule 106

JavitchBlock_1768420_pet_eABC.pdf

eFile Original Petition

JavitchBlock_1768420_let_eABC.pdf

Letter

Original Petition Citation

Original Petition Citation Issued: M/O ABC LEGAL - DALLAS

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturn of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder for Rule 106

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Substituted Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Petition Citation Issued: M/O ABC LEGAL - DALLAS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketOriginal Petition (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeFile Original Petition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLetter

    Read MoreRead Less