Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Harris County Courts on 05/08/2021 at 14:38:06 (UTC).

WIDE CAPITAL EXPRESS INC. VS G&G LABI LLC,GATIS GAJEVSKIS

Case Summary

On 04/07/2021 WIDE CAPITAL EXPRESS INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against G G LABI LLC,GATIS GAJEVSKIS. This case was filed in Harris County Courts, Harris County Civil Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is GEORGE BARNSTONE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***7228

  • Filing Date:

    04/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Harris County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Civil Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

GEORGE BARNSTONE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WIDE CAPITAL EXPRESS INC.

Defendants

GATIS GAJEVSKIS

G&G LABI LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

REGENT, ANH H

Attorney at Regent & Associates

500 Lovett Blvd. Ste. 225

Houston, TX 77006

 

Court Documents

First Amended Petition Citation

First Amended Petition Citation Issued: M/O EZ

First Amended Petition Citation

First Amended Petition Citation Issued: M/O EZ

5887307 - Amended Petition.pdf

Amended Petition

5887307_cf5aL3sKtNQA4Vv.pdf

Amended Petition: 5887307 Citation request

Amended Lawsuit - G&G Labi LLC.pdf

Amended Petition

Lawsuit - G&G Labi LLC.pdf

eFile Original Petition

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFirst Amended Petition Citation Issued: M/O EZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFirst Amended Petition Citation Issued: M/O EZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAmended Petition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAmended Petition: 5887307 Citation request

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAmended Petition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeFile Original Petition: **OWES COPY AND ISSUANCE FEE**

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer REGENT, ANH H