This case was last updated from Harris County Courts on 03/28/2020 at 14:37:54 (UTC).

WESTLAKE SERVICES, LLC VS TERRI K DAVIS

Case Summary

On 12/05/2019 WESTLAKE SERVICES, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against TERRI K DAVIS. This case was filed in Harris County Courts, Harris County Civil Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is LESLEY BRIONES. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***6563

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Harris County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Civil Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

LESLEY BRIONES

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Westlake Services, Llc

Defendant

Terri K Davis

Highlands, TX 77562-3905

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PETERSON, ERIC S

275 W. Campbell Suite 312

Richardson, TX 75080

 

Court Documents

Motion for Substituted Service

Motion for Substituted Service

Lead_Motion_eABC_filing_package.pdf

Motion for Substituted Service

JavitchBlock_1756122_pet_eABC.pdf

eFile Original Petition

Motion for Substituted Service

Order for Rule 106

Original Petition Citation

Original Petition Citation Issued: M/O ABC LEGAL - DALLAS

JavitchBlock_1756122_let_eABC.pdf

Letter

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder for Rule 106

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Substituted Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Petition Citation Issued: M/O ABC LEGAL - DALLAS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketOriginal Petition (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeFile Original Petition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLetter

    Read MoreRead Less