This case was last updated from Harris County Courts on 04/26/2020 at 17:02:35 (UTC).

WESTLAKE SERVICES, LLC VS QUITASHA Y JOHNSON

Case Summary

On 12/05/2019 WESTLAKE SERVICES, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against QUITASHA Y JOHNSON. This case was filed in Harris County Courts, Harris County Civil Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is JIM KOVACH. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***6565

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Harris County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Civil Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

JIM KOVACH

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Westlake Services, Llc

Defendant

Quitasha Y Johnson

Houston, TX 77048

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PETERSON, ERIC S

275 W. Campbell Suite 312

Richardson, TX 75080

 

Court Documents

1756584 Motion to Retain.PDF

Motion to Retain

1756584 Order.pdf

Proposed Order

Lead_Summons_eABC_filing_package.pdf

Return of Service

Original Petition Citation

Original Petition Citation Issued: M/O TO ABC-DALLAS

JavitchBlock_1756584_pet_eABC.pdf

eFile Original Petition

JavitchBlock_1756584_let_eABC.pdf

Citation to Be Issued

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion to Retain

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProposed Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturn of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Petition Citation Issued: M/O TO ABC-DALLAS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketOriginal Petition (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeFile Original Petition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCitation to Be Issued

    Read MoreRead Less