This case was last updated from Harris County Courts on 06/03/2020 at 14:52:47 (UTC).

WESTLAKE SERVICES, LLC VS MERCEDES FERRER

Case Summary

On 12/05/2019 WESTLAKE SERVICES, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against MERCEDES FERRER. This case was filed in Harris County Courts, Harris County Civil Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is LESLEY BRIONES. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***6562

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Harris County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Civil Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

LESLEY BRIONES

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Westlake Services, Llc

Defendants

Mercdes Ferrer

Katy, TX 77449-4962

Mercedes Ferrer

Katy, TX 77449-4962

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PETERSON, ERIC S

275 W. Campbell Suite 312

Richardson, TX 75080

 

Court Documents

Answer

Answer

Lead_Summons_eABC_filing_package.pdf

Return of Service

Original Petition Citation

Original Petition Citation Issued: M/O ABC LEGAL - DALLAS

JavitchBlock_1756225_pet_eABC.pdf

eFile Original Petition

JavitchBlock_1756225_let_eABC.pdf

Citation to Be Issued

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturn of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Petition Citation Issued: M/O ABC LEGAL - DALLAS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketOriginal Petition (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeFile Original Petition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCitation to Be Issued

    Read MoreRead Less