This case was last updated from Harris County Courts on 06/25/2020 at 16:55:28 (UTC).

WESTLAKE SERVICES, LLC VS JOHN P WHITE

Case Summary

On 12/05/2019 WESTLAKE SERVICES, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against JOHN P WHITE. This case was filed in Harris County Courts, Harris County Civil Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is GEORGE BARNSTONE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***6573

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Harris County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Civil Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

GEORGE BARNSTONE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Westlake Services, Llc

Defendant

John P White

Houston, TX 77089

Not Classified By Court

Dispute Resolution Center

49 San Jacinto Suite 220

Houston, TX 77002-1233

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PETERSON, ERIC S

275 W. Campbell Suite 312

Richardson, TX 75080

 

Court Documents

1757525 MFC.PDF

Motion for Continuance

1757525 Order.pdf

Proposed Order

Lead_Summons_eABC_filing_package.pdf

Return of Service: Return of Service

Answer

Answer

Order of Referral of Mediation to DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation to DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation to DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation to DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation to DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation to DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation to DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation to DRC

Original Petition Citation

Original Petition Citation Issued: M/O ABC DALLAS

JavitchBlock_1757525_pet_eABC.pdf

eFile Original Petition

JavitchBlock_1757525_let_eABC.pdf

Citation to Be Issued

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Continuance

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProposed Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder of Referral of Mediation to DRC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturn of Service: Return of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Petition Citation Issued: M/O ABC DALLAS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketOriginal Petition (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeFile Original Petition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCitation to Be Issued

    Read MoreRead Less