This case was last updated from Harris County Courts on 06/02/2020 at 14:05:08 (UTC).

WESTLAKE SERVICES, LLC VS ESBEDY REYES

Case Summary

On 12/06/2019 WESTLAKE SERVICES, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against ESBEDY REYES. This case was filed in Harris County Courts, Harris County Civil Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is LASHAWN WILLIAMS. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***6686

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Harris County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Civil Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

LASHAWN WILLIAMS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Westlake Services, Llc

Defendant

Esbedy Reyes

Houston, TX 77044-1644

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Figelman, Jacob M

Attorney at Javitch Block LLC

275 W. Campbell, Suite 312

Richardson, TX 75080

 

Court Documents

1757115 Nonsuit.PDF

Motion for Non-Suit

1757115 Order.pdf

Proposed Order: ORDER FOR NON SUIT

1757115 Order.pdf

Non-Suited or Dismissed by Plaintiff

Non-Suited or Dismissed by Plaintiff

Non-Suited or Dismissed by Plaintiff

Lead_Summons_eABC_filing_package.pdf

Return of Service

Original Petition Citation

Original Petition Citation Issued: M/O ABC LEGAL - DALLAS

JavitchBlock_1757115_pet_eABC.pdf

eFile Original Petition

JavitchBlock_1757115_let_eABC.pdf

Citation to Be Issued

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNon-Suited or Dismissed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Non-Suit

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProposed Order: ORDER FOR NON SUIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturn of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Petition Citation Issued: M/O ABC LEGAL - DALLAS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketOriginal Petition (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeFile Original Petition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCitation to Be Issued

    Read MoreRead Less