This case was last updated from Harris County Courts on 06/02/2020 at 12:08:57 (UTC).

WESTLAKE SERVICES, LLC VS ANTHONY R GUEVARA,CANDIE N ROBLES

Case Summary

On 12/05/2019 WESTLAKE SERVICES, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against ANTHONY R GUEVARA,CANDIE N ROBLES. This case was filed in Harris County Courts, Harris County Civil Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is LESLEY BRIONES. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***6601

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Harris County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Civil Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

LESLEY BRIONES

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Westlake Services, LLC

Defendants

Anthony R Guevara

Channelview, TX 77530

Candie N Robles

Channelview, TX 77530

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Figelman, Jacob M

Attorney at Javitch Block LLC

275 W. Campbell, Suite 312

Richardson, TX 75080

 

Court Documents

1756311 MFC.PDF

Motion for Continuance

1756311 Order.pdf

Proposed Order

Lead_Summons_eABC_filing_package.pdf

Return of Service

Lead_Summons_eABC_filing_package.pdf

Return of Service

Original Petition Citation

Original Petition Citation Issued: MAIL TO ABC

Original Petition Citation

Original Petition Citation Issued: MAIL TO ABC

1756311 ptn.pdf

eFile Original Petition

1756311 ltr.pdf

Letter

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Continuance

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProposed Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturn of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturn of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Petition Citation Issued: MAIL TO ABC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Petition Citation Issued: MAIL TO ABC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketOriginal Petition (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeFile Original Petition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLetter

    Read MoreRead Less