This case was last updated from Harris County Courts on 02/18/2022 at 11:54:25 (UTC).

WEST HARRIS COUNTY REGIONAL WATER AUTHORITY VS JRAG VENTURE IVT LLC,GREYSTONE SERVICING COMPANY LLC

Case Summary

On 04/13/2021 WEST HARRIS COUNTY REGIONAL WATER AUTHORITY filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against JRAG VENTURE IVT LLC,GREYSTONE SERVICING COMPANY LLC. This case was filed in Harris County Courts, Harris County Civil Courthouse located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is AUDRIE LAWTON-EVANS. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***7534

  • Filing Date:

    04/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

AUDRIE LAWTON-EVANS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

West Harris County Regional Water Authority

Defendants

Greystone Servicing Company LLC

C/O Corporation Service Company, 211 E. 7Th Street, Suite 620

Austin, TX 78701

JRAG Venture IVT LLC

C/O National Registered Agents Inc., 1999 Bryan Street, Suite 900

Dallas, TX 75201

Commissioners

Lee Arellano

Houston, TX 77019-3908

JEFFREY R. NEWPORT

Houston, TX 77024

Felecia Y. Peavy

Houston, TX 77253

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MERRELL, MARK LYNN

Attorney at MCFARLAND PLLC

811 Louisiana Street Suite 2520

Houston, TX 77002

Defendant Attorney

TODD, DAVID WILLIAM

Attorney at TODD LAW FIRM

3800 N. Lamar Blvd Suite 200

Austin, TX 78756

 

Court Documents

Order Appointing Special Commissioners.pdf

Proposed Order: Order Appointing Special Commissioners

Plaintiff's Petition for Condemnation.pdf

eFile Original Petition: Condemnation

Appointment- Sent to Judge

Order Appointing Special Commissioners

Order Appointing Special Commissioners

Order Appointing Special Commissioners

Order Appointing Special Commissioners

Order Appointing Special Commissioners

Def. Original Answer JRAG Venture IVT LLC.pdf

Answer: and Jury Demand

Plaintiff's Notice of Nonsuit - Order.pdf

Proposed Order: of Nonsuit without Prejudice

Plaintiff's Notice of Nonsuit.pdf

Motion for Non-Suit: Notice of Nonsuit

Order Approving Payment of a Fee - Sent to Judge

Order Setting Commissioners Fees

Order Approving Payment of a Fee in a Civil Case.pdf

Proposed Order: Parcel 12431-005-SS001 - Order Approving Payment of a Fee in a Civil Case

Special Commissioners Statement of Service.pdf

Statement: Parcel 12431-005-SS001 - Special Commissioner's Statements of Service

Oath of Special Commissioner - Felecia Peavy.pdf

Oath: Parcel 12431-005-SS001 - Oath of Special Commissioner - Felecia Peavy

Oath of Special Commissioner - Jeff Newport.pdf

Oath: Parcel 12431-005-SS001 - Oath of Special Commissioner - Jeffrey Newport

Oath of Special Commissioner - Lee Arellano.pdf

Oath: Parcel 12431-005-SS001 - Oath of Special Commissioner - Lee Arellano

Non-Suit - Sent to Judge

Non-Suited or Dismissed by Plaintiff

NOTICE- DISMISSAL/NONSUIT

Non-Suited or Dismissed by Plaintiff

NOTICE- DISMISSAL/NONSUIT

Non-Suited or Dismissed by Plaintiff

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNon-Suited or Dismissed by Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Non-Suit: Notice of Nonsuit

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProposed Order: of Nonsuit without Prejudice

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Setting Commissioners Fees

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOath: Parcel 12431-005-SS001 - Oath of Special Commissioner - Lee Arellano

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOath: Parcel 12431-005-SS001 - Oath of Special Commissioner - Jeffrey Newport

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOath: Parcel 12431-005-SS001 - Oath of Special Commissioner - Felecia Peavy

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatement: Parcel 12431-005-SS001 - Special Commissioner's Statements of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProposed Order: Parcel 12431-005-SS001 - Order Approving Payment of a Fee in a Civil Case

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer: and Jury Demand

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Appointing Special Commissioners

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition (OCA)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeFile Original Petition: Condemnation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProposed Order: Order Appointing Special Commissioners

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GREYSTONE SERVICING COMPANY LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer TODD, DAVID WILLIAM