Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Harris County Courts on 07/23/2021 at 14:07:36 (UTC).

WENCESLAO BENAVIDEZ VS EULILIA CARTER

Case Summary

On 01/21/2021 WENCESLAO BENAVIDEZ filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against EULILIA CARTER. This case was filed in Harris County Courts, Harris County Civil Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is LASHAWN WILLIAMS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***3997

  • Filing Date:

    01/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Harris County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Civil Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

LASHAWN WILLIAMS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Wenceslao Benavidez

Defendant

Eulilia Carter

Alexandria, LA 71303

Not Classified By Court

ROB TODD

Houston, TX 77002-1712

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

STOUWIE , KEVIN WAYNE

10500 Heritage Blvd. #102

San Antonio, TX 78216

Defendant Attorney

BRADLEY, DAVID HILL

2500 Tanglewilde Suite 250

Houston, TX 77063

 

Court Documents

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Vacation letter

Letter: Vacation letter of Kevin W. Stouwie

counters.pdf

Notice: DEFENDANT S NOTICE OF FILING COUNTER AFFIDAVIT

Notice of CA.pdf

Notice: DEFENDANT S NOTICE OF FILING COUNTER AFFIDAVIT

Exhibit A.pdf

Notice: of Filling Affidavits Concerning Costs & Necessity of Services with Attached Business Rec

WBenavides Notice Filing Medical Affidavits.pdf

Notice: of Filling Affidavits Concerning Costs & Necessity of Services with Attached Business Rec

DOA - Carter.pdf

Answer: Defendant's Original Answer (JURY FEE PAID)

CWD.pdf

Certificate of Written Discovery: Certificate of Wrtitten Discovery regarding Plaintiff's Responses to Required Disclosures

POP-.pdf

eFile Original Petition

01212021 P Counsel Request for Process to Clerk.pdf

Citation to Be Issued

Original Petition Non Resident Citation

Original Petition Citation Non-Resident Defendant Issued: M/O ATTY KEVIN STOUWIE

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLetter: Vacation letter of Kevin W. Stouwie

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice: DEFENDANT S NOTICE OF FILING COUNTER AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice: of Filling Affidavits Concerning Costs & Necessity of Services with Attached Business Rec

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Written Discovery: Certificate of Wrtitten Discovery regarding Plaintiff's Responses to Required Disclosures

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer: Defendant's Original Answer (JURY FEE PAID)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeFile Original Petition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCitation to Be Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Petition Citation Non-Resident Defendant Issued: M/O ATTY KEVIN STOUWIE

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer STOUWIE KEVIN WAYNE