This case was last updated from Harris County Courts on 06/11/2020 at 18:30:18 (UTC).

WEI CHEN VS SHERYL WIESE

Case Summary

On 12/06/2019 WEI CHEN filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against SHERYL WIESE. This case was filed in Harris County Courts, Harris County Civil Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is JIM KOVACH. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***6621

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Harris County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Civil Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

JIM KOVACH

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Wei Chen

Austin, TX 78717

Defendant

Sheryl Wiese

Cypress, TX 77429

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Withdrawal

Certificate of Withdrawal

Order to Withdraw Funds

Order to Withdraw Funds: Granted

Final Judgment

Final Judgment and Notice After Non-Jury Trial

Final Judgment

Final Judgment and Notice After Non-Jury Trial

Final Judgment and Notice After Non-Jury Trial

Final Judgment and Notice After Non-Jury Trial

Cases Appealed from Lower Courts (OCA)

Cases Appealed from Lower Courts (OCA)

Pauper's Eviction

Pauper's Eviction: FILED BY SHERYL WIESE

JP Fax Confirmation

JP Fax Confirmation: REQUEST TO TRANSFER FUNDS

JP Military Status Affidavit

JP Military Status Affidavit

JP Citation

JP Citation

JP Officer's Sworn Request for Alt Svc Under Rule 742A

JP Officer's Sworn Request for Alt Svc Under Rule 742A

JP Citation Returned

JP Citation Returned

JP Judgment

JP Judgment

JP Affidavit of Inability to Pay Costs for Appeal

JP Affidavit of Inability to Pay Costs for Appeal

JP Notice

JP Notice: OF FILING APPEAL BOND OR STATEMENT OF INABILITY TO AFFORD PAYMENT OF COSTS TO APPEAL A JUDGMENT IN A NON-PAYMENT OF RENT EVICTION

JP Notice

JP Notice: OF FILING STATEMENT OF INABILITY TO AFFORD PAYMENT OF COSTS TO APPEAL AN EVICTION JUDGMENT

Transcript from Justice of the Peace Court

Transcript from Justice of the Peace Court

JP Index

JP Index

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Withdrawal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • DocketFunds to Registry of Court: DEPOSIT JP APPEAL 194100436295 RECEIPT #2019-784 $1,950.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Withdraw Funds: Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFinal Judgment and Notice After Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCases Appealed from Lower Courts (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPauper's Eviction: FILED BY SHERYL WIESE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJP Fax Confirmation: REQUEST TO TRANSFER FUNDS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJP Military Status Affidavit

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJP Citation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJP Officer's Sworn Request for Alt Svc Under Rule 742A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJP Citation Returned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJP Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJP Affidavit of Inability to Pay Costs for Appeal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJP Notice: OF FILING APPEAL BOND OR STATEMENT OF INABILITY TO AFFORD PAYMENT OF COSTS TO APPEAL A JUDGMENT IN A NON-PAYMENT OF RENT EVICTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJP Notice: OF FILING STATEMENT OF INABILITY TO AFFORD PAYMENT OF COSTS TO APPEAL AN EVICTION JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTranscript from Justice of the Peace Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJP Index

    Read MoreRead Less