This case was last updated from Harris County Courts on 07/04/2020 at 01:31:40 (UTC).

VELOCITY INVESTMENTS, LLC VS MICHAEL WENDEL BROWN

Case Summary

On 12/05/2019 VELOCITY INVESTMENTS, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against MICHAEL WENDEL BROWN. This case was filed in Harris County Courts, Harris County Civil Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is LESLEY BRIONES. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***6567

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Harris County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Civil Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

LESLEY BRIONES

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Velocity Investments, Llc

Defendant

Michael Wendel Brown

Baytown, TX 77521

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WRUBEL , KENNEY JAMES

275 W. Campbell, Suite 312

Richardson, TX 75080

 

Court Documents

1764189 MFC.PDF

Motion for Continuance

1764189 Order.pdf

Proposed Order: PROPOSED ORDER FOR MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE

ABC 1764189.pdf

Alias Citation to be Issued: ALIAS CITATION REQUEST

Pluries Citation

Pluries Citation Issued: M/O ABC LEGAL - SEATTLE

Alias Citation

Alias Citation Issued: M/O TO ABC LEGAL

1764189 req.pdf

Citation to Be Issued

Lead_Summons_eABC_filing_package.pdf

Return of Service: Non-Service Return

Original Petition Citation

Original Petition Citation Issued: M/O ABC LEGAL - DALLAS

JavitchBlock_1764189_pet_eABC.pdf

eFile Original Petition

JavitchBlock_1764189_let_eABC.pdf

eFile Original Petition: Cover Letter

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPluries Citation Issued: M/O ABC LEGAL - SEATTLE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAlias Citation to be Issued: ALIAS CITATION REQUEST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Continuance

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProposed Order: PROPOSED ORDER FOR MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAlias Citation Issued: M/O TO ABC LEGAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCitation to Be Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCitation Returned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Petition Citation Issued: M/O ABC LEGAL - DALLAS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketOriginal Petition (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeFile Original Petition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeFile Original Petition: Cover Letter

    Read MoreRead Less