This case was last updated from Harris County Courts on 08/31/2020 at 16:54:33 (UTC).

UPGRADE, INC. VS RONNIKKA GARRETT

Case Summary

On 12/05/2019 UPGRADE, INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against RONNIKKA GARRETT. This case was filed in Harris County Courts, Harris County Civil Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is LESLEY BRIONES. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***6574

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Harris County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Civil Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

LESLEY BRIONES

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Upgrade, Inc.

Defendant

Ronnikka Garrett

Houston, TX 77066-1636

Not Classified By Court

SHERRA V. GILBERT

Houston, TX 77007

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PETERSON, ERIC S

275 W. Campbell Suite 312

Richardson, TX 75080

Defendant Attorney

Allen, Jason N.

Attorney at National Litigation Law Group

2401 Northwest Twenty-Third Street, Suite 42

Lahoma City, OK 73107

 

Court Documents

1768428 CJE.pdf

Agreed Judgment and Notice

NOTICE AGREED JUDGMENT

Agreed Judgment and Notice

NOTICE AGREED JUDGMENT

Agreed Judgment and Notice

Notices Returned

Notices Returned: Order for Referral of Mediation- Unclaimed

Ronnikka Garrett-Upgrade, Inc.-7692 Answer.pdf

Answer

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Lead_Summons_eABC_filing_package.pdf

Return of Service

Original Petition Citation

Original Petition Citation Issued: MAIL TO ABC

JavitchBlock_1768428_pet_eABC.pdf

eFile Original Petition

JavitchBlock_1768428_let_eABC.pdf

Letter

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProposed Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAgreed Judgment and Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotices Returned: Order for Referral of Mediation- Unclaimed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturn of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Petition Citation Issued: MAIL TO ABC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketOriginal Petition (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeFile Original Petition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLetter

    Read MoreRead Less