This case was last updated from Harris County Courts on 06/24/2020 at 17:04:07 (UTC).

UPGRADE, INC. VS AMY GALDAMEZ

Case Summary

On 12/05/2019 UPGRADE, INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against AMY GALDAMEZ. This case was filed in Harris County Courts, Harris County Civil Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is JIM KOVACH. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***6569

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Harris County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Civil Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

JIM KOVACH

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Upgrade, Inc.

Defendant

Amy Galdamez

Humble, TX 77396

Not Classified By Court

MICHAEL A HAWASH

Houston, TX 77019

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PETERSON, ERIC S

275 W. Campbell Suite 312

Richardson, TX 75080

Defendant Attorney

CASTRO, MICHAEL RENAN

Attorney at Law Office of Michael R. Castro, PLLC

445 E Fm 1382, Suite 3676

Cedar Hill, TX 75104

 

Court Documents

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Lead_Summons_eABC_filing_package.pdf

Return of Service

Original Answer.pdf

Answer: Original Answer

Original Petition Citation

Original Petition Citation Issued: M/O TO ABC-DALLAS

JavitchBlock_1768429_pet_eABC.pdf

eFile Original Petition

JavitchBlock_1768429_let_eABC.pdf

Letter

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer: Original Answer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturn of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Petition Citation Issued: M/O TO ABC-DALLAS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketOriginal Petition (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeFile Original Petition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLetter

    Read MoreRead Less