This case was last updated from Harris County Courts on 06/02/2020 at 12:45:22 (UTC).

TODD D GRAHAM VS FREDDIE J FARNER

Case Summary

On 12/06/2019 TODD D GRAHAM filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against FREDDIE J FARNER. This case was filed in Harris County Courts, Harris County Civil Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is GEORGE BARNSTONE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***6682

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Harris County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Civil Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

GEORGE BARNSTONE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Todd D Graham

Defendant

Freddie J Farner

Fredericksburg, TX 78624

Not Classified By Court

Dispute Resolution Center

49 San Jacinto Suite 220

Houston, TX 77002-1233

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Sternberg, Manfred, Jr.

Attorney at MANFRED STERNBERG & ASSOCIATES, P.C.

1700 Post Oak Blvd 2 Blvd. Place Suite 600

Houston, TX 77056

 

Court Documents

Order of Referral of Mediation to DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation to DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation to DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation to DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation to DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation to DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation to DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation to DRC

Letter

Letter: FROM TOMMY RODRIGUEZ

Return of Service

Return of Service

Answer

Answer

Letter to Clerk of Court .pdf

Request: Update the address for the citation

Original Petition Citation

Original Petition Citation Issued: M/O ATTY MANFRED STERNBERG

POP.pdf

eFile Original Petition

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder of Referral of Mediation to DRC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLetter: FROM TOMMY RODRIGUEZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturn of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Petition Citation Issued: M/O ATTY MANFRED STERNBERG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest: Update the address for the citation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketOriginal Petition (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeFile Original Petition

    Read MoreRead Less