This case was last updated from Harris County Courts on 07/02/2020 at 15:05:03 (UTC).

TMIF COPPER LODGE LP VS PRENTICE SIMMS,ALL OTHER OCCUPANTS

Case Summary

On 12/06/2019 TMIF COPPER LODGE LP filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against PRENTICE SIMMS,ALL OTHER OCCUPANTS. This case was filed in Harris County Courts, Harris County Civil Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is GEORGE BARNSTONE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***6640

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Harris County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Civil Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

GEORGE BARNSTONE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TMIF Copper Lodge LP

C/O Eddie Dean Young 6300 La Calma Dr,Ste 150

Austin, TX 78752

Defendants

All Other Occupants

Houston, TX 77090

Prentice Simms

Houston, TX 77090

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FOURNIER, SCOTT H

3311 Richmond Ave. Suite 305

Houston, TX 77098

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Withdrawal

Certificate of Withdrawal

Notices Returned

Notices Returned: Final Judgment - Unclaimed

Order to Withdraw Funds

Order to Withdraw Funds

Final Judgment

Final Judgment and Notice After Non-Jury Trial

Final Judgment

Final Judgment and Notice After Non-Jury Trial

Final Judgment

Final Judgment and Notice After Non-Jury Trial

Final Judgment and Notice After Non-Jury Trial

Final Judgment and Notice After Non-Jury Trial

NOA.pdf

Notice of Appearance

Letter returned

Letter returned: FROM ANGELES VILLAFRANCA REMAILED 12-16-19

JP Citation

JP Citation

JP Citation Returned

JP Citation Returned

JP Judgment

JP Judgment

JP Notice

JP Notice: OF ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION IN AN EVICTION PROCEEDING

JP Affidavit of Inability to Pay Costs for Appeal

JP Affidavit of Inability to Pay Costs for Appeal

JP Notice

JP Notice: OF FILING APPEAL BOND OR STATEMENT OF INABILITY TO AFFORD PAYMENT OF COSTS TO APPEAL A JUDGMENT IN A NON-PAYMENT OF RENT EVICTION

JP Notice

JP Notice: OF FILING STATEMENT OF INABILITY TO AFFORD PAYMENT OF COSTS TO APPEAL AN EVICTION JUDGMENT

Transcript from Justice of the Peace Court

Transcript from Justice of the Peace Court

JP Index

JP Index

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Withdrawal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotices Returned: Final Judgment - Unclaimed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Withdraw Funds

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFinal Judgment and Notice After Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • DocketFunds to Registry of Court: DEPOSIT JP APPEAL 194100439804 RECEIPT #2019-785 $950.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLetter returned: FROM ANGELES VILLAFRANCA REMAILED 12-16-19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Appearance

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate: of Last Known Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAffidavit: Supplemental Servicemembers' Affidavit

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCases Appealed from Lower Courts (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJP Military Status Affidavit

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJP Citation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJP Citation Returned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJP Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJP Notice: OF ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION IN AN EVICTION PROCEEDING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJP Affidavit of Inability to Pay Costs for Appeal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJP Notice: OF FILING APPEAL BOND OR STATEMENT OF INABILITY TO AFFORD PAYMENT OF COSTS TO APPEAL A JUDGMENT IN A NON-PAYMENT OF RENT EVICTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJP Notice: OF FILING STATEMENT OF INABILITY TO AFFORD PAYMENT OF COSTS TO APPEAL AN EVICTION JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTranscript from Justice of the Peace Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJP Index

    Read MoreRead Less