Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Harris County Courts on 05/15/2021 at 14:35:48 (UTC).

THE SHERWIN-WILLIAMS COMPANY VS ENR DRYWALL, LLC,ROBERTO DUENEZ

Case Summary

On 01/21/2021 THE SHERWIN-WILLIAMS COMPANY filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against ENR DRYWALL, LLC,ROBERTO DUENEZ. This case was filed in Harris County Courts, Harris County Civil Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is JIM KOVACH. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***4024

  • Filing Date:

    01/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Harris County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Civil Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

JIM KOVACH

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

The Sherwin-Williams Company

Defendants

ENR Drywall, LLC

C/O Roberto Duenez 4380 S. Wayside Drive, Suite 105

Houston, TX 77087

Roberto Duenez

Houston, TX 77087

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ADAIR, RANDALL F

Attorney at ADAIR MORRIS & OSBORN

325 N. St. Paul St. Suite 4100

Dallas, TX 75201

 

Court Documents

Motion for Alternative Service

Motion for Substituted Service

Order for Alternative Service

Proposed Order

Order for Rule 106 (submitted)

Order Denied: Motion for Substitute Service Denied

Original Petition Citation

Original Petition Citation Issued: M/O ATTY

Original Petition Citation

Original Petition Citation Issued: M/O ATTY

Correspondence (Service Instructions)

Letter: to Citation Clerk- Service address for Citation

Plaintiff's Original Petition.pdf

eFile Original Petition

Civil Process Request.pdf

Citation to Be Issued: ***OWES ADD ISSUE AND COPY FEES***

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Denied: Motion for Substitute Service Denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Substituted Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProposed Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Petition Citation Issued: M/O ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Petition Citation Issued: M/O ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLetter: to Citation Clerk- Service address for Citation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeFile Original Petition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCitation to Be Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where The Sherwin-Williams Company is a litigant