This case was last updated from Harris County Courts on 12/06/2022 at 03:06:53 (UTC).

THE LANDMARK AT AUBURN LAKES, LLC VS JULIUS INGRAM

Case Summary

On 06/16/2022 THE LANDMARK AT AUBURN LAKES, LLC filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against JULIUS INGRAM. This case was filed in Harris County Courts, Harris County Civil Courthouse located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is JIM KOVACH. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***6711

  • Filing Date:

    06/16/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

JIM KOVACH

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

The Landmark at Auburn Lakes, LLC

C/O Stephanie Stanford, 5755 West Raford Rd.

Spring, TX 77389

Defendant

Julius Ingram

Spring, TX 77373-7914

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Nguyen, James V

5051 Westheimer, Suite 1200

Houston, TX 77056

 

Court Documents

Notices Returned

Notices Returned: Non-Suited/Dismissed by Plaintiff

ingram-nonsuit.pdf

Motion for Non-Suit

NOTICE- DISMISSAL/NONSUIT

Non-Suited or Dismissed by Plaintiff

NOTICE- DISMISSAL/NONSUIT

Non-Suited or Dismissed by Plaintiff

Order for Nonsuit (submitted)

Non-Suited or Dismissed by Plaintiff

Pauper's Eviction

Pauper's Eviction: FILED BY JULIUS DIONE INGRAM

JP Fax Confirmation

JP Fax Confirmation: REQUEST TO TRANSFER FUNDS

Cases Appealed from Lower Courts (OCA)

Cases Appealed from Lower Courts (OCA)

JP Military Status Affidavit

JP Military Status Affidavit

JP Citation

JP Citation

JP Officer's Sworn Request for Alt Svc Under Rule 742A

JP Officer's Sworn Request for Alt Svc Under Rule 742A

JP Citation Returned

JP Citation Returned

JP Judgment

JP Judgment

JP Notice

JP Notice: of Entry of Default Judgment for Possession in an Eviction Proceeding

JP Affidavit of Inability to Pay Costs for Appeal

JP Affidavit of Inability to Pay Costs for Appeal

JP Notice

JP Notice: of Filling Statement of Inability to Afford Payment of Costs to Appeal an Eviction Judgment

Transcript from Justice of the Peace Court

Transcript from Justice of the Peace Court

JP Index

JP Index

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotices Returned: Non-Suited/Dismissed by Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNon-Suited or Dismissed by Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Non-Suit

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJP Fax Confirmation: REQUEST TO TRANSFER FUNDS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEviction Letter: FILED BY JULIUS DIONE INGRAM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJP Index

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTranscript from Justice of the Peace Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJP Order: Denying Defendant's Exparte Motion to Stay Writ of Possession

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJP Motion: Emergency Motion to Stay Writ of Possession

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJP Notice: Writ of Possession

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 06/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJP Notice: of Filling Appeal Bond or Statement of Inability to Afford Payment of Costs to Appeal a Judgment in a Non-Payment of Rent Eviction

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJP Notice: of Filling Statement of Inability to Afford Payment of Costs to Appeal an Eviction Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJP Affidavit of Inability to Pay Costs for Appeal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJP Notice: of Entry of Default Judgment for Possession in an Eviction Proceeding

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJP Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJP Citation Returned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJP Officer's Sworn Request for Alt Svc Under Rule 742A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJP Citation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJP Military Status Affidavit

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCases Appealed from Lower Courts (OCA)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where The Landmark at Auburn Lakes Llc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Nguyen, James V