This case was last updated from Harris County Courts on 06/02/2020 at 12:59:10 (UTC).

TD AUTO FINANCE, LLC VS SUCCESS N OBIKA AGHO

Case Summary

On 12/05/2019 TD AUTO FINANCE, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against SUCCESS N OBIKA AGHO. This case was filed in Harris County Courts, Harris County Civil Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is JIM KOVACH. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***6531

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Harris County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Civil Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

JIM KOVACH

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TD AUTO FINANCE, LLC

Defendant

SUCCESS N OBIKA AGHO

Houston, TX 77042-3208

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Garza, Kyle Kasner

15660 N. Dallas Parkway, Suite 350

Dallas, TX 75248

 

Court Documents

5500502 AFF.pdf

Citation Returned: Unserved

3916831_Dismissal_EFILE-n.pdf

Motion for Non-Suit

3916831_Dismissal_EFILE-o.pdf

Proposed Order: Granting for Non-Suit

3916831_Dismissal_EFILE-o.pdf

Non-Suited or Dismissed by Plaintiff

NOTICE- DISMISSAL/NONSUIT

Non-Suited or Dismissed by Plaintiff

Original Petition Citation

Original Petition Adms Disc Int Prod Citation Issued: M/O TO EZ

5500502-36255359-yjzAhGR8KUX0vE5.pdf

eFile Original Petition

5500502-36256612-PEPv6VigLg1EWJU.pdf

Citation to Be Issued

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNon-Suited or Dismissed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Non-Suit

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProposed Order: Granting for Non-Suit

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCitation Returned: Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Petition Adms Disc Int Prod Citation Issued: M/O TO EZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketOriginal Petition (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeFile Original Petition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCitation to Be Issued

    Read MoreRead Less