This case was last updated from Harris County Courts on 06/02/2020 at 12:43:18 (UTC).

TD AUTO FINANCE, LLC VS GILBERT M MARTINEZ

Case Summary

On 12/05/2019 TD AUTO FINANCE, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against GILBERT M MARTINEZ. This case was filed in Harris County Courts, Harris County Civil Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is LESLEY BRIONES. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***6532

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Harris County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Civil Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

LESLEY BRIONES

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TD AUTO FINANCE, LLC

Defendant

GILBERT M MARTINEZ

Houston, TX 77055

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Garza, Kyle Kasner

15660 N. Dallas Parkway, Suite 350

Dallas, TX 75248

 

Court Documents

3916834_notice.pdf

Motion for Non-Suit: Notice of Non Suit

3916834_ordere.pdf

Proposed Order: Order Granting of Non Suit

5500504-36660722-meJdaCEAZRkBjhl.pdf

Citation Returned

NOTICE- DISMISSAL/NONSUIT

Non-Suited or Dismissed by Plaintiff

NOTICE- DISMISSAL/NONSUIT

Non-Suited or Dismissed by Plaintiff

Non-Suited or Dismissed by Plaintiff

Non-Suited or Dismissed by Plaintiff

HRG NTC 3916834.pdf

Notice of Trial From Party

Original Petition Citation

Original Petition Adms Disc Int Prod Citation Issued: MAIL TO EZM

5500504-36255485-hGmW3fZnFRRgXT5.pdf

eFile Original Petition

5500504-36256613-QwJ86QTRge7yXV1.pdf

Citation to Be Issued

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Non-Suit: Notice of Non Suit

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProposed Order: Order Granting of Non Suit

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCitation Returned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNon-Suited or Dismissed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Trial From Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Petition Adms Disc Int Prod Citation Issued: MAIL TO EZM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketOriginal Petition (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeFile Original Petition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCitation to Be Issued

    Read MoreRead Less