This case was last updated from Harris County Courts on 01/26/2023 at 07:57:06 (UTC).

TBF FINANCIAL, LLC VS MILDRED ANN ALLEN

Case Summary

On 12/08/2022 TBF FINANCIAL, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against MILDRED ANN ALLEN. This case was filed in Harris County Courts, Harris County Civil Courthouse located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is LASHAWN WILLIAMS. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***6298

  • Filing Date:

    12/08/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

LASHAWN WILLIAMS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TBF Financial, LLC

Defendant

Mildred Ann Allen

Houston, TX 77021

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Holmes, Michael S.

9708 Hillcroft Street

Houston, TX 77096

 

Court Documents

Original Petition

eFile Original Petition

Request for Service of Process Form

Citation to Be Issued

Original Petition Citation

Original Petition Citation Issued: M/O ATTY MICHAEL S. HOLMES

Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss Case

Motion to Dismiss: **sent to judge

Order Dismissing Cause of Action

Proposed Order

Nonsuit--sent

Non-Suited or Dismissed by Plaintiff

NOTICE- DISMISSAL/NONSUIT

Non-Suited or Dismissed by Plaintiff

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNon-Suited or Dismissed by Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProposed Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion to Dismiss: **sent to judge

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Petition Citation Issued: M/O ATTY MICHAEL S. HOLMES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCitation to Be Issued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeFile Original Petition

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2022
  • DocketOriginal Petition (OCA)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less