This case was last updated from Harris County Courts on 06/02/2020 at 14:08:10 (UTC).

SYNCHRONY BANK VS TONY UPTON

Case Summary

On 12/06/2019 SYNCHRONY BANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against TONY UPTON. This case was filed in Harris County Courts, Harris County Civil Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is JIM KOVACH. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***6658

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Harris County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Civil Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

JIM KOVACH

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SYNCHRONY BANK

Defendant

TONY UPTON

Huffman, TX 77336

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Oha, Chidi

Attorney at ZWICKER & ASSOCIATES, P.C.

14090 Sw Freewa, Suite 408

Sugar Land, TX 77478

 

Court Documents

20200309_SYN_UPTON,TONY_RULE 11.pdf

Rule 11 Agreement: Rule 11 Settlement Agreement

20200309_SYN_UPTON,TONY_AJ.pdf

Proposed Order: Agreed Judgment

Agreed Judgment.pdf

Agreed Judgment and Notice

NOTICE AGREED JUDGMENT

Agreed Judgment and Notice

NOTICE AGREED JUDGMENT

Agreed Judgment and Notice

5502747-36720986-N2vfibMGtPGyQxa.pdf

Return of Service: 5502747 Affidavit File Pack

Original Petition Citation

Original Petition Citation Issued: M/O TO EZ

5502747-36240180-Unfiled Original Petition-xwGFjnG1g5tF44O.PDF

eFile Original Petition

5502747_4TpcNEAvEZML1Ly.pdf

Citation to Be Issued

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAgreed Judgment and Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRule 11 Agreement: Rule 11 Settlement Agreement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProposed Order: Agreed Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturn of Service: 5502747 Affidavit File Pack

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Petition Citation Issued: M/O TO EZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketOriginal Petition (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeFile Original Petition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCitation to Be Issued

    Read MoreRead Less