This case was last updated from Harris County Courts on 06/24/2020 at 19:16:47 (UTC).

SYNCHRONY BANK VS JULIE ALVARADO

Case Summary

On 12/06/2019 SYNCHRONY BANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against JULIE ALVARADO. This case was filed in Harris County Courts, Harris County Civil Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is GEORGE BARNSTONE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***6643

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Harris County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Civil Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

GEORGE BARNSTONE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SYNCHRONY BANK

Defendant

JULIE ALVARADO

Houston, TX 77044

Not Classified By Court

Dispute Resolution Center

49 San Jacinto Suite 220

Houston, TX 77002-1233

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Owens, Sharrard D

Attorney at ZWICKER & ASSOCIATES, P.C.

14090 Sw Freeway, Suite 408

Sugarland, TX 77478

Defendant Attorney

Fernandez, David

2190 North Loop West Suite 333

Houston, TX 77018

 

Court Documents

Alvarado Julie- AMFC.pdf

Motion for Continuance

alvarado1_20200224123838.PDF

Certificate: Plaintiff's Certificate of Unfiled Discovery

alvarado2_20200224123850.PDF

Certificate: Plaintiff's Certificate of Unfiled Discovery

Order of Referral of Mediation to DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation to DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation to DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation to DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation to DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation to DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation to DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation to DRC

County Court DOA-Julie Alvarado.pdf

Answer

5502723 AFF.pdf

Return of Service

Original Petition Citation

Original Petition Citation Issued: M/O TO EZ

5502723-36239896-Unfiled Original Petition-tDAS3MHb0NWKgEE.PDF

eFile Original Petition

5502723_aCcQoam6MZvlQ32.pdf

Citation to Be Issued

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Continuance

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate: Plaintiff's Certificate of Unfiled Discovery

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder of Referral of Mediation to DRC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturn of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Petition Citation Issued: M/O TO EZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketOriginal Petition (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeFile Original Petition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCitation to Be Issued

    Read MoreRead Less