Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Harris County Courts on 03/09/2017 at 20:06:15 (UTC).

STATE OF TX ET AL. VS. DAVIS HOLDINGS LP ET AL.

Case Summary

On 06/22/2011 STATE OF TX filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against DAVIS HOLDINGS LP. This case was filed in Harris County Courts, Harris County Civil Courts located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **4947

  • Filing Date:

    06/22/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Harris County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Civil Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF TX

Defendants

SPRINT*DBA*ETAL

Austin, TX 78701

HARRIS CTY HOSP DIST

2525 Holly Hall

Houston, TX 77054

CITY OF HOUSTON

Houston, TX 77002

SECURITY STORE*DBA*ETAL

9572 Hempstead Hwy

Houston, TX 77092

CROWN COMM INC*DBA*ETAL

350 No St Paul St #2900

Dallas, TX 75201

AMERICAN WHEEL & T2LTD

9550 Hempstead Hwy

Houston, TX 77092

COUNTY HARRIS

1001 Preston #911

Houston, TX 77002

NEXTEL OFTX INC

211 E 7Th St #620

Austin, TX 78701

HOUSTON COMMUN COL

3100 Main St

Houston, TX 77002

NSC FIBERTOWER

Dallas, TX 75201

SPRING BR MGMT DIST

10103 Fondren Rd #300

Houston, TX 77096

CROWN CASTLE GT CLLC

Dallas, TX 75201

NEXTEL COM*DBA*ETAL

Austin, TX 78701

VERIZON WIRELESS TLLC

Dallas, TX 75201

HOUSTON INDEP SCH DIST

4400 West 18Th St

Houston, TX 77092

DEMERIS BARBECUE INC

2911 So Shepherd

Houston, TX 77098

HARRIS CTY DEPT EPFC

6300 Irvington Blvd

Houston, TX 77022

AMERICAN WHEEL & TI

9550 Hempstead Hwy

Houston, TX 77092

Not Classified By Court

MICHAEL JAMES SCHLESS

Austin, TX 78705

7 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

MCGETTIGAN JR, PATRICK J

Attorney at SINGLETON COOKSEY PLLC

6363 Woodway Ste 600

Houston, TX 77057

Other Attorneys

MCFARLAND, CHARLES BLACK

Attorney at MCFARLAND PLLC

712 Main Street, Suite 1500

Houston, TX 77002

BLACKWELDER, JEFFREY A

Attorney at ASSISTANT ATTORNEY GENERAL

P O Box 12548, Capitol Station

Austin, TX 78711

 

Court Documents

Case Initiation Event (OCA)

Case Initiation Event (OCA)

Original Petition (Filing Fee)

Original Petition (Filing Fee): PLTF ORIGINAL PETITION FILED REAL PROPERTY EMINENT DOMAIN STATE OF TEXAS VS DAVIS HOLDINGS LP ETAL Film code Number 798923464

Cash Receipt

Cash Receipt: CR #748565 NO FEE PAID BY TRANSPORTATION DIVISIO STATE OF TEXAS VS DAVIS HOLDINGS LP ETAL FILING CONDEMANTION FILING FEE DEFFERED UNTIL END OF SUIT SEE ATTORNEY GENERAL OPINION 124 Film code Number 798923463

Information Sheet

Information Sheet: CIVIL CASE INFO SHT Film code Number 798923475

Order

Order: APPTNG SPEC COMNR GRANTED Film code Number 798936754

Oath

Oath: OF SPECIAL COMNR Film code Number 799815542

Cash Receipt

Cash Receipt: CR #752462 AMT $40.00 PAID BY STATE OF TEXAS STATE OF TEXAS VS DAVIS HOLDINGS LP ETAL FILING FEE FOR CONDEMANTION PREV FILED Film code Number 799896797

Answer

Answer: DEFTS ORIG ANS FILED BY PATRICK J MCGETTIGAN Film code Number 799920729

Cash Receipt

Cash Receipt: CR #752959 AMT $2.00 PAID BY SINGLETON COOKSEY PLLC STATE OF TEXAS VS DAVIS HOLDINGS LP ETAL E-FILE ANSWER Film code Number 799924000

Agreed Judgment and Notice

Agreed Judgment and Notice: SIGNED IN COURT Film code number CCCL-2012-112776

Agreed Judgment and Notice

Agreed Judgment and Notice: SIGNED IN COURT Film code number CCCL-2012-112776

Agreed Judgment and Notice

Agreed Judgment and Notice: SIGNED IN COURT Film code number CCCL-2012-112776

Agreed Judgment and Notice

Agreed Judgment and Notice: SIGNED IN COURT Film code number CCCL-2012-112776

Order Not Entered

Order Not Entered: AGREED JUDGMENT Film code number CCCL-2012-113595

Notices Returned

Notices Returned: AGREED JUDGMENT IN FAVOR OF PLAINTIFF NOTICE OF JUDGMENT Film code number CCCL-2012-132350

Notice of Judgment

Notice of Judgment: AGREED JUDGMENT IN FAVOR OF PLAINTIFF RETURNED UNDELIVERED Film code number CCCL-2012-130783

Exhibit

Exhibit: DEFENDANT'S BILL OF COSTS Film code number CCCL-2012-185742

Precept to be Issued

Precept to be Issued: FILING FEE FOR PRECEPTS PREVIOUSLY ISSUED Film code number CCCL-2012-303860

145 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/31/2012
  • RECEIPT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Precept to be Issued: FILING FEE FOR PRECEPTS PREVIOUSLY ISSUED Film code number CCCL-2012-303860

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2012
  • RECEIPT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Exhibit: DEFENDANT'S BILL OF COSTS Film code number CCCL-2012-185742

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2012
  • Electronic Filing Fee: BILL OF COSTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Judgment: AGREED JUDGMENT IN FAVOR OF PLAINTIFF RETURNED UNDELIVERED Film code number CCCL-2012-130783

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Notices Returned: AGREED JUDGMENT IN FAVOR OF PLAINTIFF NOTICE OF JUDGMENT Film code number CCCL-2012-132350

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Order Not Entered: AGREED JUDGMENT Film code number CCCL-2012-113595

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Agreed Judgment and Notice: SIGNED IN COURT Film code number CCCL-2012-112776

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion: FOR ENTRY OF AGREED FINAL JUDGMENT Film code number CCCL-2012-112926

    Read MoreRead Less
147 More Docket Entries
  • 07/22/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Amendment to Original Petition: PLAINTIFF FIRST AMENDED PETITION REAL PROPERTY EMINENT DOMAIN 1ST AMD PETN FOR CONDEMNATION Film code Number 799955826

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Cash Receipt: CR #752959 AMT $2.00 PAID BY SINGLETON COOKSEY PLLC STATE OF TEXAS VS DAVIS HOLDINGS LP ETAL E-FILE ANSWER Film code Number 799924000

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Answer: DEFTS ORIG ANS FILED BY PATRICK J MCGETTIGAN Film code Number 799920729

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Cash Receipt: CR #752462 AMT $40.00 PAID BY STATE OF TEXAS STATE OF TEXAS VS DAVIS HOLDINGS LP ETAL FILING FEE FOR CONDEMANTION PREV FILED Film code Number 799896797

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Oath: OF SPECIAL COMNR Film code Number 799815542

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Order: APPTNG SPEC COMNR GRANTED Film code Number 798936754

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Information Sheet: CIVIL CASE INFO SHT Film code Number 798923475

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Cash Receipt: CR #748565 NO FEE PAID BY TRANSPORTATION DIVISIO STATE OF TEXAS VS DAVIS HOLDINGS LP ETAL FILING CONDEMANTION FILING FEE DEFFERED UNTIL END OF SUIT SEE ATTORNEY GENERAL OPINION 124 Film code Number 798923463

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Original Petition (Filing Fee): PLTF ORIGINAL PETITION FILED REAL PROPERTY EMINENT DOMAIN STATE OF TEXAS VS DAVIS HOLDINGS LP ETAL Film code Number 798923464

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Initiation Event (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where COUNTY OF HARRIS is a litigant

Latest cases where HOUSTON INDEP SCH DIST ET is a litigant

Latest cases where HARRIS CTY HOSP DIST is a litigant