Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Harris County Courts on 03/15/2017 at 16:45:39 (UTC).

STATE OF TEXAS VS. TEXAS BRIDGEGATE ASSOCIATES LP

Case Summary

On 06/23/2014 STATE OF TEXAS filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against TEXAS BRIDGEGATE ASSOCIATES LP. This case was filed in Harris County Courts, Harris County Civil Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is THERESA CHANG. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***9223

  • Filing Date:

    06/23/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Harris County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Civil Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

THERESA CHANG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF TEXAS

Defendants

TEXAS BRIDGEGATE ASSOCIATES LP

Cameron Atchison 6500 West 43Rd St

Houston, TX 77092

WILTZ CHERI

Houston, TX 77092

WILLIAMS SHERATHEA D

Houston, TX 77092

VILLATORO RODOLFO

Houston, TX 77092

VILLAFUERTE LOURDES

Houston, TX 77092

STEWART WILLIE

Houston, TX 77092

SOLIS SANJUANA

Houston, TX 77092

SOLIS AURELIO C

Houston, TX 77092

SHACKELFORD BRENDA GAIL

Houston, TX 77092

SHACKELFORD BRITTON

Houston, TX 77092

SERRANO SULEIMA

Houston, TX 77092

SALINAS LUCIANO ROSALES

Houston, TX 77092

RUANO VILMA

Houston, TX 77092

ROSENDO IVONNE

Houston, TX 77092

ROSALES VIOLETA M

Houston, TX 77092

ROLAN RICHARD W

Houston, TX 77092

REID SANDRA

Houston, TX 77092

REID LUTHER

Houston, TX 77092

RAZO HORTENICA

Houston, TX 77092

79 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

BARHAM MISTY HABERER

Po Box 12548

Austin, TX 78711

ARNOLD, PHILIP BARR

Attorney at ASSISTANT ATTORNEY GENERAL

P.O. Box 12548

Austin, TX 78711-2548

Defendant Attorney

NEESE, DONALD JOHN

Attorney at HAWASH MEADE GASTON NEESE & CICACK LLP

2118 Smith Street

Houston, TX 77002

 

Court Documents

Notice of Hearing of Special Commissioners

Notice of Hearing of Special Commissioners: TO ELAINE A LOPEZ SERVED ON NOVEMBER 12, 2014 Film code number CCCL-2014-395844

Objections

Objections: OBJECTION FILED BY PHILIP ARNOLD Film code number CCCL-2015-6711

Notices Returned

Notices Returned: AWARD OF SPECIAL COMMISSIONERS-NENA CALVIN Film code number CCCL-2015-4001

Notices Returned

Notices Returned: AWARD OF SPECIAL COMMISSIONERS-CAROLYN MEL BUTTS, A SINGLE WOMAN AWARD OF SPECIAL COMMISSIONERS-CAROLYN MEL BUTTS, A SINGLE WOMAN UNABLE TO FORWARD Film code number CCCL-2015-40811

Notices Returned

Notices Returned: AWARD OF SPECIAL COMMISSIONERS-CAROLYN MEL BUTTS, A SINGLE WOMAN Film code number CCCL-2015-40821

Citation Returned

Citation Returned: SERVED 02-03-15 TO SHERATHEA D WILLIAMS Film code number CCCL-2015-43658

Citation Returned

Citation Returned: UNSERVED Film code number CCCL-2015-58877

Agreed Judgment and Notice

Agreed Judgment and Notice

Notice of Judgment

Notice of Judgment: AGREED JUDGMENT IN FAVOR OF PLAINTIFF RETURNED UNDELIVERED Film code number CCCL-2015-413846

Designation of Lead Counsel

Designation of Lead Counsel: FOR DEFENDANT TEXAS BRIDGEGATE ASSOCIATES, LP Film code number CCCL-2014-238091

Crt 2-Order for Trial Setting-NonJury

Crt 2-Order for Trial Setting-NonJury

Waiver

Waiver: WAIVER OF SERVICE OF DEFENDANTS OBJECTIONS TO AWARD OF SPECIAL COMMISSIONERS Film code number CCCL-2015-3413

Notices Returned

Notices Returned: AWARD OF SPECIAL COMMISSIONERS-BRITTON SHACKELFORD, A SINGLE MAN Film code number CCCL-2015-24022

Precept Issued

Precept Issued

Precept Issued

Precept Issued

Order to Withdraw Funds

Order to Withdraw Funds: -901 GRANTED Film code number CCCL-2015-60921

Order Not Entered

Order Not Entered: ORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER Film code number CCCL-2015-246566

Notice of Judgment

Notice of Judgment: AGREED JUDGMENT IN FAVOR OF PLAINTIFF RETURNED UNDELIVERED Film code number CCCL-2015-413816

129 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/07/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Judgment: AGREED JUDGMENT IN FAVOR OF PLAINTIFF RETURNED UNDELIVERED Film code number CCCL-2015-413848

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Judgment: AGREED JUDGMENT IN FAVOR OF PLAINTIFF RETURNED UNDELIVERED Film code number CCCL-2015-413846

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Judgment: AGREED JUDGMENT IN FAVOR OF PLAINTIFF RETURNED UNDELIVERED Film code number CCCL-2015-413839

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Judgment: AGREED JUDGMENT IN FAVOR OF PLAINTIFF RETURNED UNDELIVERED Film code number CCCL-2015-413821

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Judgment: AGREED JUDGMENT IN FAVOR OF PLAINTIFF RETURNED UNDELIVERED Film code number CCCL-2015-413816

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Judgment: AGREED JUDGMENT IN FAVOR OF PLAINTIFF RETURNED UNDELIVERED Film code number CCCL-2015-413810

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Judgment: AGREED JUDGMENT IN FAVOR OF PLAINTIFF RETURNED UNDELIVERED Film code number CCCL-2015-413807

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Judgment: AGREED JUDGMENT IN FAVOR OF PLAINTIFF RETURNED UNDELIVERED Film code number CCCL-2015-413804

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Judgment: AGREED JUDGMENT IN FAVOR OF PLAINTIFF RETURNED UNDELIVERED Film code number CCCL-2015-413797

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Judgment: AGREED JUDGMENT IN FAVOR OF PLAINTIFF RETURNED UNDELIVERED Film code number CCCL-2015-413793

    Read MoreRead Less
231 More Docket Entries
  • 07/16/2014
  • RECEIPT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Oath of Special Commissioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Designation of Lead Counsel: FOR DEFENDANT TEXAS BRIDGEGATE ASSOCIATES, LP Film code number CCCL-2014-238091

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2014
  • Electronic Filing Fee: DESIGNATION OF COUNSEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Order: ORDER APPOINTING SPECIAL COMMISSIONERS Film code number CCCL-2014-224019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2014
  • RECEIPT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2014
  • Electronic Filing Fee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Information Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2014
  • RECEIVABLE GENERATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Initiation Event (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less