This case was last updated from Harris County Courts on 03/15/2017 at 22:16:01 (UTC).

STATE OF TEXAS VS. JOEL GONZALEZ ET AL.

Case Summary

On 08/20/2014 STATE OF TEXAS filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against JOEL GONZALEZ. This case was filed in Harris County Courts, Harris County Civil Courthouse located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is ROBERTA LLOYD. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***1936

  • Filing Date:

    08/20/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

ROBERTA LLOYD

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF TEXAS

Defendants

PORT OF HOUSTON AUTHORITY

HOUSTON INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT

HOUSTON COMMUNITY COLLEGE

HARRIS COUNTY HOSPITAL DISTRICT

HARRIS COUNTY FLOOD CONTROL DISTRICT

HARRIS COUNTY DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION

COUNTY OF HARRIS TEXAS

CITY OF HOUSTON

AMERICUS MORTGAGE CORPORATION

MERLISE RODRIGUEZ

ILIANA LUZEMA GONZALEZ

JOEL GONZALEZ

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

OWENS SAMANTHA LEE

P.O. Box 12548

Austin, TX 78711

OWENS, SAMANTHA LEE

Attorney at ATTORNEY GENERAL OF TEXAS

P.O. Box 12548

Austin, TX 78711

 

Court Documents

Case Initiation Event (OCA)

Case Initiation Event (OCA)

Cover Letter

Cover Letter

Civil Case Information Sheet

Civil Case Information Sheet

Order

Order: ORDER APPOINTING SPECIAL COMMISSIONERS Film code number CCCL-2014-293181

Oath of Special Commissioner

Oath of Special Commissioner

Order

Order: ORDER SETTING HEARING BEFORE SPECIAL COMMISSIONERS Film code number CCCL-2014-404036

Final Judgment and Notice After Non-Jury Trial

Final Judgment and Notice After Non-Jury Trial

Final Judgment and Notice After Non-Jury Trial

Final Judgment and Notice After Non-Jury Trial

Final Judgment and Notice After Non-Jury Trial

Final Judgment and Notice After Non-Jury Trial

Final Judgment and Notice After Non-Jury Trial

Final Judgment and Notice After Non-Jury Trial

Final Judgment and Notice After Non-Jury Trial

Final Judgment and Notice After Non-Jury Trial

Final Judgment and Notice After Non-Jury Trial

Final Judgment and Notice After Non-Jury Trial

Final Judgment and Notice After Non-Jury Trial

Final Judgment and Notice After Non-Jury Trial

Final Judgment and Notice After Non-Jury Trial

Final Judgment and Notice After Non-Jury Trial

Final Judgment and Notice After Non-Jury Trial

Final Judgment and Notice After Non-Jury Trial

Final Judgment and Notice After Non-Jury Trial

Final Judgment and Notice After Non-Jury Trial

Final Judgment and Notice After Non-Jury Trial

Final Judgment and Notice After Non-Jury Trial

Notices Returned

Notices Returned: FINAL JUDGMENT IN FAVOR OF PLAINTIFF NOTICE OF JUDGMENT Film code number CCCL-2015-372770

52 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotices Returned: FINAL JUDGMENT IN FAVOR OF PLAINTIFF NOTICE OF JUDGMENT Film code number CCCL-2015-372770

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFinal Judgment and Notice After Non-Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/01/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLetter: FROM MARGEY M HARRISON Film code number CCCL-2015-357471

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/01/2015
  • DocketRECEIPT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/01/2015
  • DocketElectronic Filing Fee: COVER LETTER & JUDGMENT OF COURT IN ABSENCE OF OBJECTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Withdrawal: -901 Film code number CCCL-2015-206135

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Withdrawal: -901 Film code number CCCL-2015-206131

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAffidavit of Check Disbursement: -901 Film code number CCCL-2015-196886

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotices Returned: AWARD OF SPECIAL COMMISSIONERS- MERLISE RODRIGUEZ UNABLE TO FORWARD Film code number CCCL-2015-187417

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotices Returned: AWARD OF SPECIAL COMMISSIONERS-MERLISE RODRIGUEZ Film code number CCCL-2015-187413

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
51 More Docket Entries
  • 12/02/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder: ORDER SETTING HEARING BEFORE SPECIAL COMMISSIONERS Film code number CCCL-2014-404036

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2014
  • DocketElectronic Filing Fee: ORDER SETTING HEARING BEFORE SPECIAL COMMISSIONERS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOath of Special Commissioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/28/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder: ORDER APPOINTING SPECIAL COMMISSIONERS Film code number CCCL-2014-293181

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/21/2014
  • DocketRECEIPT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/20/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Information Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/20/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCover Letter

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/20/2014
  • DocketElectronic Filing Fee

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/20/2014
  • DocketRECEIVABLE GENERATED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/20/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Initiation Event (OCA)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where COUNTY OF HARRIS, TEXAS is a litigant

Latest cases where HARRIS COUNTY DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION is a litigant

Latest cases where Port of Houston Authority is a litigant

Latest cases where Harris County Hospital District is a litigant