Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Harris County Courts on 03/15/2017 at 21:52:49 (UTC).

STATE FARM COUNTY MUTUAL AUTO INS CO VS. ANTONIO SANCHEZ ET AL.

Case Summary

On 08/15/2014 STATE FARM COUNTY MUTUAL AUTO INS CO filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against ANTONIO SANCHEZ. This case was filed in Harris County Courts, Harris County Civil Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is CLYDE LEUCHTAG. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***1730

  • Filing Date:

    08/15/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Harris County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Civil Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

CLYDE LEUCHTAG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE FARM COUNTY MUTUAL AUTO INS CO

Defendants

SHLOMO ITSHAK

Houston, TX 77031

KABALAKIE MICHAEL

Houston, TX 77031

SANCHEZ ANTONIO

A 1 AUTO BODY & PAINT SHOP

ITSHAK SHLOMO

Houston, TX 77031

ANTONIO SANCHEZ

MICHAEL KABALAKIE

Houston, TX 77031

Not Classified By Court

Dispute Resolution Center

49 San Jacinto Suite 220

Houston, TX 77002-1233

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

HOOD DONALD E

Attorney at DICKMAN LAW OFFICES PLLC

6440 N Central Exprwy #200

Dallas, TX 75206

HOOD, DONALD E

Attorney at DICKMAN LAW OFFICES PLLC

6440 N Central Exprwy #200

Dallas, TX 75206

Defendant Attorneys

WHALEN MICHAEL C

9668 Westheimer Suite200-901

Houston, TX 77063

Whalen, Michael C

 

Court Documents

Cases Appealed from Lower Courts (OCA)

Cases Appealed from Lower Courts (OCA)

JP Receipts

JP Receipts

JP Citation

JP Citation: A 1 AUTO BODY & PAINT SHOP Film code number CCCL-2014-275534

Affidavit of Service

Affidavit of Service: JP APPEALED Film code number CCCL-2014-275537

JP Motion

JP Motion: FOR PARTIAL NONSUIT Film code number CCCL-2014-275539

JP Order

JP Order: FOR PARTIAL NONSUIT Film code number CCCL-2014-275540

Letter

Letter: JP APPEALED LETTER FROM DANIEL J. PETERS Film code number CCCL-2014-275543

JP Motion

JP Motion: PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT Film code number CCCL-2014-275546

Letter

Letter: JP APPEALED LETTER FROM JESSICA R. LOBES Film code number CCCL-2014-275547

Crt 1-Order for Trial Resetting-Non Jury

Crt 1-Order for Trial Resetting-Non Jury

Crt 1-Order for Trial Resetting-Non Jury

Crt 1-Order for Trial Resetting-Non Jury

Crt 1-Order for Trial Resetting-Non Jury

Crt 1-Order for Trial Resetting-Non Jury

Final Judgment and Notice After Non-Jury Trial

Final Judgment and Notice After Non-Jury Trial: SIGNED IN COURT Film code number CCCL-2015-245215

Final Judgment and Notice After Non-Jury Trial

Final Judgment and Notice After Non-Jury Trial: SIGNED IN COURT Film code number CCCL-2015-245215

Final Judgment and Notice After Non-Jury Trial

Final Judgment and Notice After Non-Jury Trial: SIGNED IN COURT Film code number CCCL-2015-245215

Notices Returned

Notices Returned: FINAL JUDGMENT IN FAVOR OF PLAINTIFF NOTICE OF JUDGMENT Film code number CCCL-2015-315770

Notices Returned

Notices Returned: ORDER FOR TRIAL RESETING Film code number CCCL-2015-315772

Notices Returned

Notices Returned: ORDER FOR TRIAL RESETING Film code number CCCL-2015-315773

41 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/15/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Notices Returned: ORDER FOR TRIAL RESETING Film code number CCCL-2015-315773

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Notices Returned: ORDER FOR TRIAL RESETING Film code number CCCL-2015-315772

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Notices Returned: FINAL JUDGMENT IN FAVOR OF PLAINTIFF NOTICE OF JUDGMENT Film code number CCCL-2015-315770

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Final Judgment and Notice After Non-Jury Trial: SIGNED IN COURT Film code number CCCL-2015-245215

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Crt 1-Order for Trial Resetting-Non Jury

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Crt 1-Order for Trial Resetting-Non Jury

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Crt 1-Order for Trial Resetting-Non Jury

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2014
  • RECEIPT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Agreed Motion: FOR CONTINUANCE Film code number CCCL-2014-392678

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2014
  • Electronic Filing Fee: MOTION & ORDER FOR CONTINUANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 08/15/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Letter: JP APPEALED LETTER FROM JESSICA R. LOBES Film code number CCCL-2014-275547

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • JP Motion: PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT Film code number CCCL-2014-275546

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Letter: JP APPEALED LETTER FROM DANIEL J. PETERS Film code number CCCL-2014-275543

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • JP Order: FOR PARTIAL NONSUIT Film code number CCCL-2014-275540

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • JP Motion: FOR PARTIAL NONSUIT Film code number CCCL-2014-275539

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Affidavit of Service: JP APPEALED Film code number CCCL-2014-275537

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • JP Citation: A 1 AUTO BODY & PAINT SHOP Film code number CCCL-2014-275534

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • JP Receipts

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2014
  • RECEIVABLE GENERATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Cases Appealed from Lower Courts (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Dispute Resolution Center is a litigant