This case was last updated from Harris County Courts on 08/01/2020 at 17:03:11 (UTC).

SRC NASA OWNER, LP VS TERESA WESTERMAYR

Case Summary

On 12/05/2019 SRC NASA OWNER, LP filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against TERESA WESTERMAYR. This case was filed in Harris County Courts, Harris County Civil Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is JIM KOVACH. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***6577

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Harris County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Civil Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

JIM KOVACH

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SRC Nasa Owner, LP

Defendant

Teresa Westermayr

Houston, TX 77062

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WOMAC, BRIAN D.

Attorney at WOMAC LAW

8301 Katy Freeway

Houston, TX 77024

 

Court Documents

Request for Abstract 3-6-20.pdf

Abstract of Judgment to be Issued

Abstract

Abstract Issued

FDJ-Order.pdf

Default Judgment and Notice

NOTICE-DEFAULT JUDGMENT

Default Judgment and Notice

NOTICE-DEFAULT JUDGMENT

Default Judgment and Notice

NMA.pdf

Motion for Default Judgment

Aff.-Att. Fees.pdf

Motion for Default Judgment

Aff.-Mellas.pdf

Motion for Default Judgment

CLKMA.pdf

Motion for Default Judgment

MDJ.pdf

Motion for Default Judgment

NOS-MDJ.pdf

Notice of Submission

FDJ-Order.pdf

Proposed Order: Final Default Judgment

Return of Service

Return of Service

Original Petition Citation

Original Petition Citation Issued: CONSTABLE

Ex. B - Guaranty.pdf

eFile Original Petition

Ex. A - Alpine Braus Lease.pdf

eFile Original Petition

Ex. D - Dltr. - TOP-Alpine 11-21-19.pdf

eFile Original Petition

POP-Alpine.pdf

eFile Original Petition

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAbstract Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAbstract of Judgment to be Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDefault Judgment and Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Default Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Submission

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProposed Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturn of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Petition Citation Issued: CONSTABLE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketOriginal Petition (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeFile Original Petition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCitation to Be Issued

    Read MoreRead Less